EP1551792 - NOVEL BETA MIMETICS WITH EXTENDED DURATION OF ACTION, METHOD FOR PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF AS MEDICAMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co.KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUYSSOU, Thierry Bergrubenweg 21 88447 Birkenhard / DE | 02 /
BUETTNER, Frank Friedhofstrasse 16 88448 Attenweiler / DE | 03 /
KONETZKI, Ingo Müllerweg 9 88447 Warthausen / DE | 04 /
PESTEL, Sabine Friedhofstrasse 12 88448 Attenweiler / DE | 05 /
SCHNAPP, Andreas Esterbuch 5 88400 Biberach / DE | 06 /
SCHOLLENBERGER, Hermann Hauff-Strasse 4 55218 Ingelheim / DE | 07 /
SCHROMM, Kurt In der Doerrwiese 35 55218 Ingelheim / DE | 08 /
HEINE, Claudia Georg-Schinbain-Strasse 66 88400 Biberach / DE | [2006/18] |
Former [2005/28] | 01 /
BOUYSSOU, Thierry Ulrich-Schmid-Strasse 7 88487 Mietingen / DE | ||
02 /
BUETTNER, Frank Friedhofstrasse 16 88448 Attenweiler / DE | |||
03 /
KONETZKI, Ingo Müllerweg 9 88447 Warthausen / DE | |||
04 /
PESTEL, Sabine Friedhofstrasse 12 88448 Attenweiler / DE | |||
05 /
SCHNAPP, Andreas Esterbuch 5 88400 Biberach / DE | |||
06 /
SCHOLLENBERGER, Hermann Hauff-Strasse 4 55218 Ingelheim / DE | |||
07 /
SCHROMM, Kurt In der Doerrwiese 35 55218 Ingelheim / DE | |||
08 /
HEINE, Claudia Georg-Schinbain-Strasse 66 88400 Biberach / DE | Application number, filing date | 03750623.5 | 25.09.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003EP10661 | Priority number, date | DE2002146374 | 04.10.2002 Original published format: DE 10246374 | [2005/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004033412 | Date: | 22.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1551792 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07C217/70, A61K31/135, A61P11/06, A61P17/00, A61P9/06 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
C07C217/70 (EP);
A61K31/137 (EP);
A61K31/18 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P15/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/137, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/18, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] | Extension states | AL | 04.05.2005 | LT | 04.05.2005 | LV | 04.05.2005 | MK | 04.05.2005 | Title | German: | NEUE BETAMIMETIKA MIT VERLÄNGERTER WIRKUNGSDAUER, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS ARZNEIMITTEL | [2005/28] | English: | NOVEL BETA MIMETICS WITH EXTENDED DURATION OF ACTION, METHOD FOR PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF AS MEDICAMENTS | [2005/28] | French: | NOUVEAUX BETAMIMETIQUES A DUREE D'ACTION PROLONGEE, PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION ET D'UTILISATION COMME MEDICAMENTS | [2005/28] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 01.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/08] | 18.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0321864 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM KG [DE], et al) [X] 1,8-13 * Verbindung auf Seite 42, Zeilen 28-34 und dazu führende Zwischenprodukte gemäss Seite 40, Zeile 17 - Seite 41, Zeile 28; Anspruch 1 (Seite 47, Zeile 50); Anspruch 2; Seite 12, Zeilen 43-55 * [Y] 1-14; | [Y]DE1543374 (BOEHRINGER SOHN INGELHEIM) [Y] 1-14 * Anspruch 1; Beispiele 3, 6, 7, 10, 11 und 13; Seite 8, zweiter Absatz *; | [Y]WO0183462 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE], et al) [Y] 1-14 * Anspruch 1; Seite 10, Zeilen 9-22 * |