EP1522043 - DETECTION OR IDENTIFICATION ANTENNA INSENSITIVE TO THE ENVIRONMENT THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pygmalyon 66, rue Louis Becker 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Jean-Marc 38 sente Du Pré F-95320 SAINT LEU LA FORET / FR | [2005/15] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2010/03] |
Former [2009/31] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12 Rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | ||
Former [2009/31] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03750819.9 | 17.07.2003 | [2005/15] | WO2003FR02267 | Priority number, date | FR20020009052 | 17.07.2002 Original published format: FR 0209052 | [2005/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005010811 | Date: | 03.02.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1522043 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | CPC: |
H01Q1/2225 (EP,KR,US);
G06K19/027 (EP,KR,US);
G06K19/07749 (EP,KR,US);
G06K19/07771 (EP,KR,US);
G06K19/07779 (EP,KR,US);
G06K19/07783 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q1/22 (KR);
H01Q1/273 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q1/38 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q7/00 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEGEN UMWELTEINFLÜSSE UNEMPFINDLICHE RESONANZANTENNE ZUR DETEKTION ODER IDENTIFIZIERUNG | [2005/15] | English: | DETECTION OR IDENTIFICATION ANTENNA INSENSITIVE TO THE ENVIRONMENT THEREOF | [2005/15] | French: | ANTENNE RESONNANTE DE DETECTION OU D'IDENTIFICATION INSENSIBLE A SON ENVIRONNEMENT | [2005/15] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/15] | 30.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/47] | 06.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   15.09.2009 | 31.07.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0704816 (HUGHES IDENTIFICATION DEVICES [US]) [A] 2,4 * column 4, line 13 - line 24 * * claims 3,4 *; | [A]EP0786357 (ROHM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 9,10* figures 3,15,16 *; | [XY]US6161761 (GHAEM SANJAR [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-10 * column 4, line 39 - line 46 * * column 5, line 5 - column 6, line 19 * * column 7, line 4 - line 26 * * column 7, line 50 - line 62 * * figure 1 * [Y] 11; | [X]US6164551 (ALTWASSER RICHARD [DE]) [X] 1-8 * column 2, line 1 - line 36 * * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 33 *; | [A]FR2803439 (A S K [FR]) [A] 7-10 * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 19 * * page 6, line 29 - line 32 * * figure 3 *; | [YA]DE10056148 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * figures 1,2,4 * [A] 1,10 | Examination | GB2333062 |