EP1554586 - Identification of drugs against mycobacteria [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/29] | SCREENING METHOD | ||
[2009/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Council of Scientific and Industrial Research Rafi Marg New Delhi 110 001 / IN | [2010/10] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states Council of Scientific and Industrial Research Rafi Marg New Delhi 110 001 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TYAGI, Jaya S., All India Ins. of Medical Sciences Dept. of Biotechnology, Ansari Nagar 110 029 New Delhi / IN | 02 /
SAINI, Deepak K. All India Ins. of Medical Sciencs Dept. of Biotechnology, Ansari Nagar 110 029 New Delhi / IN | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Long, Giorgio Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | Long, Giorgio Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03751127.6 | 16.10.2003 | [2005/29] | WO2003IB04555 | Priority number, date | US20020418837P | 16.10.2002 Original published format: US 418837 P | [2005/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004036224 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1554586 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1554586 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, A61P31/04, // A61K31/10 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
C12Q1/18 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C12Q1/485 (EP,US);
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
G01N2500/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/29] | G01N33/68, A61K31/00, A61P31/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Identifikation von Arzneimittel gegen Mykobakterien | [2009/45] | English: | Identification of drugs against mycobacteria | [2009/45] | French: | Identification des médicaments contre des mycobactéries | [2009/45] |
Former [2005/29] | SCREENINGVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2005/29] | SCREENING METHOD | ||
Former [2005/29] | PROCEDE DE CRIBLAGE | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 08.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.03.2010 | BE | 10.03.2010 | CY | 10.03.2010 | CZ | 10.03.2010 | DK | 10.03.2010 | EE | 10.03.2010 | FI | 10.03.2010 | IT | 10.03.2010 | NL | 10.03.2010 | RO | 10.03.2010 | SE | 10.03.2010 | SI | 10.03.2010 | SK | 10.03.2010 | TR | 10.03.2010 | BG | 10.06.2010 | GR | 11.06.2010 | ES | 21.06.2010 | PT | 12.07.2010 | HU | 11.09.2010 | IE | 16.10.2010 | LU | 16.10.2010 | CH | 31.10.2010 | LI | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
BE | 10.03.2010 | ||
CY | 10.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
HU | 11.09.2010 | ||
IE | 16.10.2010 | ||
LU | 16.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
BE | 10.03.2010 | ||
CY | 10.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
HU | 11.09.2010 | ||
IE | 16.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
BE | 10.03.2010 | ||
CY | 10.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
IE | 16.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
BE | 10.03.2010 | ||
CY | 10.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
BE | 10.03.2010 | ||
CY | 10.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
BE | 10.03.2010 | ||
CY | 10.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
BE | 10.03.2010 | ||
CY | 10.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
BE | 10.03.2010 | ||
CY | 10.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
BE | 10.03.2010 | ||
CY | 10.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
BE | 10.03.2010 | ||
CY | 10.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
BE | 10.03.2010 | ||
CY | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | SI | 10.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4975280 (SCHACHT ETIENNE [BE], et al) [X] 17-21 * column 2, line 18 - line 26; examples 1,2; claims 1,5,9,60,61 *; | [A]WO0248391 (INST OF MOLECUL & CELL BIOLOGY [SG], et al) [A] 1-21 * page 2, line 9 - line 30; examples 5-7; claims 1-7,12 * * page 15, line 25 - page 16, line L *; | [X] - SANDER P ET AL, "Contribution of the multidrug efflux pump LfrA to innate mycobacterial drug resistance.", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY LETTERS. 1 DEC 2000, (20001201), vol. 193, no. 1, ISSN 0378-1097, pages 19 - 23, XP002285066 [X] 8-16 * page 21, column L, line 18 - page 22, column L, line 3; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1097(00)00456-0 | [X] - DARAFARIN AMIR ET AL, "Synthesis and antimicrobial activities of some 2-mercaptobenzimidazole derivatives", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1992), Database accession no. PREV199395117347, XP002285067 [X] 8-16 * abstract * | [DA] - MAYURI ET AL, "Molecular analysis of the dormancy response in Mycobacterium smegmatis: expression analysis of genes encoding the DevR-DevS two-component system, Rv3134c and chaperone alpha-crystallin homologues.", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY LETTERS. 4 JUN 2002, (20020604), vol. 211, no. 2, ISSN 0378-1097, pages 231 - 237, XP002285065 [DA] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1097(02)00684-5 | [DA] - DASGUPTA N ET AL, "CHARACTERIZATION OF A TWO-COMPONENT SYSTEM, DEVR-DEVS, OF MYCOBACTERIUM TUBERCULOSIS", TUBERCLE, LONGMAN GROUP UK LTD., HARLOW, GB, (2000), vol. 80, no. 3, ISSN 0041-3879, pages 141 - 159, XP009024893 [DA] 1-21 * page 141, column L, paragraph 1 - page 142, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 144, column L, paragraph 4 - column R, paragraph 1 * * page 145, column R, paragraph 3 - page 146, column R, line L * * page 152, column R, paragraph L - page 155, column R, paragraph 1; figure 7 * * page 157, column L, paragraph 2 - page 158, column L, paragraph 2 * | [A] - SAINI D K ET AL, "Cloning, Overexpression, Purification, and Matrix-Assisted Refolding of DevS (Rv 3132c) Histidine Protein Kinase of Mycobacterium tuberculosis", PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, CA, US, (200206), vol. 25, no. 1, ISSN 1046-5928, pages 203 - 208, XP004467025 [A] 1-21 * abstract * * page 203, column R, line 17 - page 205, column L, line 16 * * page 206, column L, paragraph L - column R, line 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/prep.2002.1628 |