EP1579166 - EVAPORATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Modine Korea, LLC 121 Maegok-ri, Tangjeong-myon 336-843 Asan Chungcheongnam-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states Modine Korea, LLC 121 Maegok-ri, Tangjeong-myon 336-843 Asan Chungcheongnam-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Jae-Heon 103-203 Hanra Apt., Dongsan-ri, Tangjeong-myon 336-843 Asan, Chungcheongnam-do / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jae-Hoon 201-805 Hanra Apt., Dongsan-ri, Tangjeong-myon 336-843 Asan, Chungcheongnam-do / KR | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Urner, Peter Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | Urner, Peter TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03751554.1 | 15.10.2003 | [2005/39] | WO2003KR02138 | Priority number, date | KR20020087801 | 31.12.2002 Original published format: KR 2002087801 | KR20030010306 | 19.02.2003 Original published format: KR 2003010306 | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004059235 | Date: | 15.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1579166 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/00 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
F28F9/0224 (EP,US);
F28F9/013 (KR);
F28D1/05391 (EP,US);
F28F9/0207 (EP,US);
F28F9/0246 (EP,US);
F28F9/0253 (EP,US);
F28D2021/0085 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2005/39] | Title | German: | VERDAMPFER | [2005/39] | English: | EVAPORATOR | [2005/39] | French: | EVAPORATEUR | [2005/39] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 29.08.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US6340055 (YAMAUCHI YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0584993 (VALEO ENGINE COOLING INC [US]); | [A]US2002066553 (FISCHER EWALD [DE], et al); | [A]KR100225506B (MANDO MACHINE CO LTD [KR]) |