EP1546612 - DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE QUALITY OF AMBIENT AIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.08.2007 [2007/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innosource B.V. Vennestraat 17 2161 LE Lisse / NL | [2005/41] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Vroege, Norbert Peter Hofbrouckerlaan 6 2341 LN Oegstgeest / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vroege, Norbert Peter Hofbrouckerlaan 6 2341 LN OEGSTGEEST / NL | [2005/46] |
Former [2005/41] | 01 /
Vroege, Norbert Peter Madame Curiestraat 6 2171 TW Sassenheim / NL | ||
Former [2005/26] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | van Westenbrugge, Andries Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 03751618.4 | 30.09.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003NL00671 | Priority number, date | NL20021021562 | 30.09.2002 Original published format: NL 1021562 | [2005/26] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004029517 | Date: | 08.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1546612 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/00 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
F24F11/30 (EP,US);
F24F11/526 (EP,US);
F24F2110/50 (EP);
F24F2110/70 (EP);
Y02B30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR FESTSTELLUNG DER UMGEBUNGSLUFTQUALITÄT | [2005/26] | English: | DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE QUALITY OF AMBIENT AIR | [2005/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER LA QUALITE D'AIR AMBIANT | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2004 | Translation filed | 30.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 13.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/33] | 30.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10213341 ; | [Y]US4462246 (ADVANI GULU N [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]EP0518327 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0592796 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 2-4 *; | [A]GB2280978 (SPENCER BENEDICT CHAPLIN [GB], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]US5394934 (REIN ALAN D [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5428964 (LOBDELL VINCENT G [US]); | [A]US5589824 (LYNCH ADAM Q [US]) [A] 2,3,6 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 18 * * figures 5,6 *; | [AD]DE19700964 (PROBST MAX JOSEF [DE]); | [A]US5936532 (PERALTA DAVID A [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE19855056 (AUMA TEC AUSBAU UMWELT UND ANL [DE]) [A] 4 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO0137231 (SIMULATION SYSTEMS AND APPLIC [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 7, line 25 - page 9, line 7 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE10028333 (BAUER ARMIN [DE], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10213341 A 19980811 (TAKENAKA KOMUTEN CO LTD; KUBOTA KUCHO KK; KUBOTA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |