EP1539062 - SOFT CLING FEMALE CONDOM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PATH 1455 N.W. Leary Way Seattle, WA 98107-5136 / US | [2005/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAM, Lisa 2629 N.E. 82nd Street Seattle, WA 98115 / US | 02 /
AUSTIN, Glenn, D. 11050 Palatine Avenue N. Seattle, WA 98133 / US | 03 /
SEAMANS, Yancy 457 N.E. 60th Street Seattle, WA 98115 / US | 04 /
VAN LEW, William Robert Jr. Apt. J304, 17735 105t h Place S.E. Renton, WA 98055 / US | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Tombling, Adrian George Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Tombling, Adrian George Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03752525.0 | 19.09.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003US29661 | Priority number, date | US20020411771P | 19.09.2002 Original published format: US 411771 P | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004026168 | Date: | 01.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1539062 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1539062 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61F6/06 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
A61F6/065 (EP,US);
Y10S128/918 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEICHES UND HAFTENDES KONDOM FÜR FRAUEN | [2009/18] | English: | SOFT CLING FEMALE CONDOM | [2005/24] | French: | CONDOM FEMELLE SOUPLE ADHERENT | [2005/24] |
Former [2005/24] | WEIBLICHES KONDOM AUS WEICHER FOLIE | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 04.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.08.2010 | BE | 04.08.2010 | CY | 04.08.2010 | CZ | 04.08.2010 | DK | 04.08.2010 | EE | 04.08.2010 | FI | 04.08.2010 | IT | 04.08.2010 | NL | 04.08.2010 | RO | 04.08.2010 | SE | 04.08.2010 | SI | 04.08.2010 | SK | 04.08.2010 | TR | 04.08.2010 | IE | 19.09.2010 | LU | 19.09.2010 | CH | 30.09.2010 | LI | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | FR | 04.10.2010 | BG | 04.11.2010 | GR | 05.11.2010 | ES | 15.11.2010 | PT | 06.12.2010 | HU | 05.02.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 19.09.2010 | ||
LU | 19.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 04.10.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
HU | 05.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 19.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 04.10.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
HU | 05.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 19.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 04.10.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
NL | 04.08.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002038658 (AUSTIN GLENN D [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,13-15 * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0095] ** figures 4,9,22,24 * | International search | [A]US4867176 (LASH HARVEY [US]); | [A]US5992415 (ALLA RAVIKUMAR [US], et al); | [A]US6341607 (COUVREUR CHANTAL [BE]); | [X]US2002038658 (AUSTIN GLENN D [US], et al) |