EP1504500 - METHOD FOR SEALING PARTITION BUSHING CONNECTOR COAXIAL CONTACTS, ADAPTED COAXIAL CONTACT AND RESULTING CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Positronic Industries Z.I. Est, 46, route d'Engachies 32020 Auch Cedex 09 / FR | [2005/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GENTRY, John 3049 S'Arcadia Ave Springfield, MO 65806 / US | [2005/16] |
Former [2005/06] | 01 /
GENTRY, John 1236 S. Weller Aenue Sprin Springfield, MO 65804 / US | Representative(s) | Godard, Xavier, et al COLBERT INNOVATION TOULOUSE 2ter Rue Gustave de Clausade, BP 30 81800 Rabastens / FR | [2018/09] |
Former [2010/07] | Richebourg, Michel François, et al Cabinet Michel Richebourg Le Clos du Golf 69, rue Saint-Simon 42000 Saint-Etienne / FR | ||
Former [2006/31] | Thurgood, Alexander John, et al Cabinet Richebourg "Le Clos du Golf" 69, rue Saint-Simon 42000 Saint-Etienne / FR | ||
Former [2005/06] | Richebourg, Michel François Cabinet Michel Richebourg, "Le Clos du Golf", 69, rue Saint-Simon 42000 Saint Etienne / FR | Application number, filing date | 03752811.4 | 15.05.2003 | [2005/06] | WO2003FR01474 | Priority number, date | FR20020005940 | 15.05.2002 Original published format: FR 0205940 | [2005/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03098747 | Date: | 27.11.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1504500 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1504500 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/52 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
H01R13/521 (EP,US);
Y10S439/936 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/09] |
Former [2005/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR KOAXIALE DURCHFÜHRUNG, KOAXIALER KONTAKT UND VERBINDUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2017/39] | English: | METHOD FOR SEALING PARTITION BUSHING CONNECTOR COAXIAL CONTACTS, ADAPTED COAXIAL CONTACT AND RESULTING CONNECTOR | [2005/06] | French: | PROCEDE DE SCELLAGE DE CONTACTS DE CONNECTEUR DE TRAVERSEE DE CLOISON DE TYPE COAXIAUX, CONTACT COAXIAL ADAPTE ET CONNECTEUR AINSI OBTENU | [2005/06] |
Former [2005/06] | VERFAHREN ZUM VERSIEGELN VON PARTITIONS-HÜLSEN-VERBINDER-KOAXIALKONTAKTEN, ANGEPASSTER KOAXIALKONTAKT UND RESULTIERENDER VERBINDER | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 14.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2003 | AT | 28.02.2018 | CY | 28.02.2018 | CZ | 28.02.2018 | DK | 28.02.2018 | EE | 28.02.2018 | ES | 28.02.2018 | FI | 28.02.2018 | IT | 28.02.2018 | MC | 28.02.2018 | NL | 28.02.2018 | PT | 28.02.2018 | RO | 28.02.2018 | SE | 28.02.2018 | SI | 28.02.2018 | SK | 28.02.2018 | TR | 28.02.2018 | IE | 15.05.2018 | LU | 15.05.2018 | BG | 28.05.2018 | GB | 28.05.2018 | GR | 29.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | CH | 31.05.2018 | LI | 31.05.2018 | [2020/28] |
Former [2020/16] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IE | 15.05.2018 | ||
LU | 15.05.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GB | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
IE | 15.05.2018 | ||
LU | 15.05.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GB | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
IE | 15.05.2018 | ||
LU | 15.05.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GB | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
IE | 15.05.2018 | ||
LU | 15.05.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 15.05.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6300572 (MCKAY MICHAEL JOHN [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 28 *; | [A]US4480151 (DOZIER HILLIARD [US]) | Examination | US5613880 |