EP1506988 - PLASMA DISPLAY UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2005/07] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AOKI, Masaki 5-12-1, Aoshinke Mino-shi, Osaka 562-0024 / JP | 02 /
KAWAMURA, Hiroyuki 5-28-9, Fujigao Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0022 / JP | 03 /
SUGIMOTO, Kazuhiko 138-8-A-201, Hazukashishimizu-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8485 / JP | 04 /
OTANI, Mitsuhiro 3-8-31, Koryonakamachi Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-0024 / JP | 05 /
SETOGUCHI, Hiroshi 33-10-101, Kitashowadai-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-0816 / JP | 06 /
HIBINO, Junichi 919-1-A712, Uchiage Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0802 / JP | [2005/07] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03752902.1 | 15.05.2003 | [2005/07] | WO2003JP06046 | Priority number, date | JP20020142658 | 17.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002142658 | [2005/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03097766 | Date: | 27.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1506988 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/64, C09K11/08, H01J11/02 | [2005/07] | CPC: |
H01J11/42 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/7734 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/7792 (EP,KR,US);
H01J11/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2005/36] |
Former [2005/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PLASMA-BILDSCHIRMGERÄT | [2005/07] | English: | PLASMA DISPLAY UNIT | [2005/07] | French: | ECRAN PLASMA | [2005/07] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2004 | Translation filed | 22.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2004 | Examination requested [2005/07] | 05.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/21] | 09.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS59102979 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 4 * * table 1 *; | [A]JP2000226574 (DAIDEN CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0006] - [0013] * * figures 1-3 * * tables 1,2 *; | [A]EP1030339 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]US6187225 (RAO RAVILISETTY P [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, lines 1-34 * * column 3, lines 27-30,59,65 * * example VIII * * claims 3,15 *; | [X]JP2002097466 (KASEI OPTONIX) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0022] , [0027] - [0038] - [0050] - [0053] * * examples 1,6-11 * * table 4 *; | [A] - T. JÜSTEL ET. AL., "Optimization of Luminescent Materials for Plasma Display Panels", ADVANCED MATERIALS, WILEY-VCH, (2000), vol. 12, no. 7, pages 527 - 530, XP002438167 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * * especially page 529 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-4095(200004)12:7<527::AID-ADMA527>3.0.CO;2-8 | [A] - S. OSHIO ET. AL., "Mechanism of Luminance decrease in BaMgAl10O17:Eu2+ Phosphor by Oxidation", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, The Electrochemical Society, (199811), vol. 145, no. 11, pages 3903 - 3907, XP002439318 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.1838891 | [A] - SHUXIU ZHANG1 ET AL, "25.1:Improvement on Longevity of Blue Phosphor for PDP Applications", SID 01 DIGEST, (2001), vol. XXXII, page 414, XP007007682 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPS59102979 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP); | [A]US5350971 (JEONG IL-HYEOK [KR]); | [A]EP0697453 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP], et al) |