EP1506990 - PLASMA DISPLAY UNIT, PHOSPHOR AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PHOSPHOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2005/07] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AOKI, Masaki 5-12-1, Aoshinke Mino-shi, Osaka 562-0024 / JP | 02 /
KAWAMURA, Hiroyuki 5-28-9, Fujigao Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0022 / JP | 03 /
SUGIMOTO, Kazuhiko 138-8-A-201, Hazukashishimizu-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8485 / JP | 04 /
OTANI, Mitsuhiro 3-8-31, Koryonakamachi Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-0024 / JP | 05 /
SETOGUCHI, Hiroshi 33-10-101, Kitashowadai-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-0816 / JP | 06 /
HIBINO, Junichi 919-1-A712, Uchiage Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0802 / JP | [2005/07] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03752904.7 | 15.05.2003 | [2005/07] | WO2003JP06048 | Priority number, date | JP20020142661 | 17.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002142661 | [2005/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03097768 | Date: | 27.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1506990 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/64, C09K11/08, H01J11/02 | [2005/07] | CPC: |
H01J11/12 (EP,US);
H01J11/42 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/7734 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2005/36] |
Former [2005/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PLASMA-BILDSCHIRMGERÄT, LEUCHTSTOFF UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES LEUCHTSTOFFS | [2005/07] | English: | PLASMA DISPLAY UNIT, PHOSPHOR AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PHOSPHOR | [2005/07] | French: | ECRAN PLASMA, PHOSPHORE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PHOSPHORE | [2005/07] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2004 | Translation filed | 29.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2004 | Examination requested [2005/07] | 29.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/21] | 09.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1030339 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO03025090 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1-7 * abstract * * the whole document *; | [A] - T. JÜSTEL ET. AL., "Optimization of Luminescent Materials for Plasma Display Panels", ADVANCED MATERIALS, WILEY-VCH, (2000), vol. 12, no. 7, pages 527 - 530, XP002438167 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-4095(200004)12:7<527::AID-ADMA527>3.0.CO;2-8 | International search | [A]JPH08115673 (KASEI OPTONIX, et al); | [A]JPH09310067 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH11181418 (KASEI OPTONIX); | [A]US6096243 (OSHIO SHOUZO [JP], et al); | [A]JP2000226575 (DAIDEN CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2001055567 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JP2002080848 (HITACHI LTD) |