EP1506877 - INK-JET RECORDING PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OJI PAPER CO., LTD. 7-5, Ginza 4-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/07] | For all designated states Oji Paper Co., Ltd. 7-5, Ginza 4-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASANO, Shinichi, Oji Paper Co., Ltd. Shinonome Res.Ctr., 1-10-6, Shinonome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8558 / JP | 02 /
HIRAKI, Motoko, Oji Paper Co., Ltd. Sinonome Res.Ctr., 1-10-6, Shinonome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8558 / JP | [2005/07] | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/07] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03752923.7 | 20.05.2003 | [2005/07] | WO2003JP06276 | Priority number, date | JP20020146460 | 21.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002146460 | [2005/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03097370 | Date: | 27.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1506877 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/52 | [2009/43] | CPC: |
B41M5/5254 (EP,US);
B41M5/00 (KR);
B41J2/01 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2005/07] | B41M5/00, B41J2/01 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/36] |
Former [2005/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNGSPAPIER | [2005/07] | English: | INK-JET RECORDING PAPER | [2005/07] | French: | SUPPORT PAPIER POUR JET D'ENCRE | [2005/07] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2004 | Translation filed | 10.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 26.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/07] | 30.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/31] | 19.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1555868 (M & T CHEMICALS INC) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5460874 (RAO S PRABHAKARA [US]) [A] 1-10 * claim - * * column 2, line 24 - line 55 *; | [A]US6291553 (HARRISON DAVID BRYAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-10* claims 5,6 * | International search | [Y]JPH10309865 (DAICEL CHEM); | [Y]JP2002086905 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [Y]JPS6322812 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND); | [Y]JPH0641492 (DAICEL CHEM) | by applicant | US5275846 | JPH0789220 |