EP1558497 - POURING SPOUT SEAL FOR COMPOSITE PACKAGINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIG Technology Ltd. Laufengasse 18 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [2005/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEUENBERGER, Markus Bahnhofstrasse 20 CH-8240 Thayingen / CH | 02 /
KRAUS, Jochen Alemannenstrasse 14 78239 Rielasingen-Worblingen / DE | [2006/20] |
Former [2005/31] | 01 /
LEUENBERGER, Markus Bahnhofstrasse 20 CH-8240 Thayingen / CH | ||
02 /
KRAUS, Jochen Aluminiumstrasse 14 78224 Singen-Hohentwiel / DE | Representative(s) | Felber, Josef Felber & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 116 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Felber, Josef Felber & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 116 Postfach 105 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 03753199.3 | 24.10.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003CH00695 | Priority number, date | CH20020001816 | 29.10.2002 Original published format: CH 18162002 | [2005/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004039684 | Date: | 13.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1558497 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1558497 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/74 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
B65D5/749 (EP,US);
B65D5/74 (KR);
B65D2401/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSGIESSER-VERSCHLUSS FÜR VERBUNDPACKUNGEN | [2005/31] | English: | POURING SPOUT SEAL FOR COMPOSITE PACKAGINGS | [2005/31] | French: | SYSTEME DE FERMETURE A BEC VERSEUR POUR EMBALLAGES COMPOSITES | [2005/31] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 26.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.04.2007 | DK | 18.04.2007 | EE | 18.04.2007 | FI | 18.04.2007 | IE | 18.04.2007 | RO | 18.04.2007 | SI | 18.04.2007 | SK | 18.04.2007 | BG | 18.07.2007 | SE | 18.07.2007 | PT | 18.09.2007 | HU | 19.10.2007 | LU | 24.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | [2012/42] |
Former [2009/39] | CY | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
EE | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
RO | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
LU | 24.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
EE | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
RO | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | DK | 18.04.2007 | |
EE | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
RO | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | DK | 18.04.2007 | |
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
RO | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | DK | 18.04.2007 | |
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | DK | 18.04.2007 | |
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | DK | 18.04.2007 | |
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | DK | 18.04.2007 | |
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | DK | 18.04.2007 | |
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 18.04.2007 | |
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | SI | 18.04.2007 | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPH08119265 ; | [XA]EP0291112 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 10 - column 7, line 39; figures 1-4 * [A] 2-10; | [XA]US5287983 (REIL WILHELM [DE], et al) [X] 1 * column 8, line 46 - column 9, line 58; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-10; | [XA]EP0658480 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 38 - column 5, line 20; figures 1-7 * [A] 2-10; | [XA]FR2738552 (RICAL SA [FR]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 35 - page 8, line 34; figures 1-5 * [A] 2-10; | [XA]DE19635088 (PKL VERPACKUNGSSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 6 - column 3, line 52; figures 1-3 * [A] 2-10 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 1996, no. 09, & JP08119265 A 19960514 (SHIKOKU KAKOKI CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-10 |