EP1639800 - ONLINE CHARGING IN MOBILE NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2016/10] |
Former [2015/35] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHLBÄCK, Hans Axstigen 2 B 28 FIN-20720 Turku / FI | 02 /
HAKALA, Harri, Tapani Rossinkatu 2 F 7 FIN-20380 Turku / FI | 03 /
KUIKKA, Matti Valpperintie 6 FIN-21310 Vahto / FI | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2016/10] |
Former [2006/13] | Lind, Robert Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03753574.7 | 18.06.2003 | [2006/13] | WO2003EP50235 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005004456 | Date: | 13.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1639800 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1639800 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04M15/00 | [2015/37] | CPC: |
H04M17/02 (EP,US);
G06Q20/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/16 (EP,US);
G06Q20/32 (EP,US);
G06Q20/363 (EP,US);
G06Q20/38215 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40 (EP,US);
G06Q20/403 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0613 (EP,US);
G07F7/0866 (EP,US);
H04M15/00 (EP,US);
H04M15/48 (EP,US);
H04M15/68 (EP,US);
H04M15/8038 (EP,US);
H04M17/204 (EP,US);
H04W4/24 (EP,US);
H04M2017/24 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0196 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/13] | H04M17/00, G07F19/00, G07F7/08, H04M15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/10] |
Former [2006/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ONLINE ABRECHNUNG IN MOBILEN NETZWERKEN | [2006/13] | English: | ONLINE CHARGING IN MOBILE NETWORKS | [2006/13] | French: | PROCEDE DE DEBIT EN LIGNE DANS DES RESEAUX MOBILES | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 15.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.06.2003 | AT | 09.03.2016 | BE | 09.03.2016 | CY | 09.03.2016 | CZ | 09.03.2016 | DK | 09.03.2016 | EE | 09.03.2016 | ES | 09.03.2016 | FI | 09.03.2016 | IT | 09.03.2016 | MC | 09.03.2016 | NL | 09.03.2016 | RO | 09.03.2016 | SE | 09.03.2016 | SI | 09.03.2016 | SK | 09.03.2016 | TR | 09.03.2016 | BG | 09.06.2016 | GR | 10.06.2016 | IE | 18.06.2016 | LU | 18.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | FR | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | PT | 11.07.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 18.06.2003 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IE | 18.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IE | 18.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 09.03.2016 | |
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5412726 (NEVOUX ROLA [FR], et al) [A] 1-14* claim 1 *; | [A]EP1104973 (FIRST HOP OY [FI]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-4,9,11 *; | [A]US2001037264 (HUSEMANN DIRK [CH], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0103] *; | [A]US2002161723 (ASOKAN NADARAJAH [FI], et al) [A] 1-14 * claim 1 *; | [A] - KRAYEM-NEVOUX R ET AL, "Payphone service for third generation mobile systems", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 1993, INCLUDING A COMMUNICATIONS THEORY MINI-CONFERENCE. TECHNICAL PROGRAM CONFERENCE RECORD, IEEE IN HOUSTON. GLOBECOM '93., IEEE HOUSTON, TX, USA 29 NOV.-2 DEC. 1993, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19931129), ISBN 0-7803-0917-0, pages 1708 - 1712, XP010109936 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.1993.318361 | Examination | US2003033518 | EP1713289 | - ""Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Telecommunication management; Charging management; Charging principles (3GPP TS 32.200 version 5.4.0 Release 5); ETSI TS 132 200",", XP014009928 | - 3GPP, "3GPP TS 33.220 v6.0.0 (2004-03) 3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Generic Authentication Architecture (GAA); Generic bootstrapping architecture (Release 6)", 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP); TECHNICALSPECIFICATION (TS), XX, XX, (20040322), vol. 33.220, no. V6.0.0, pages 1 - 18, XP002422872 |