EP1673717 - DUAL CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Starbucks Corporation d.b.a Starbucks Coffee Company P.O. Box 34067 Seattle, WA 98124 / US | [2006/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COURTION, Colette 4532 Latona Avenue NE Seattle, WA 98105 / US | 02 /
STUMPF, Mary 10516 39th Avenue SW Seattle, WA 98146 / US | [2006/26] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03753837.8 | 13.10.2003 | [2006/26] | WO2003IB04512 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005048145 | Date: | 26.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1673717 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
G07F7/0866 (EP);
G06Q20/34 (KR);
G06Q20/227 (EP);
G06Q20/3572 (EP);
G06Q40/02 (KR);
G07F7/025 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/26] | G06Q10/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOPPELKARTE | [2006/26] | English: | DUAL CARD | [2006/26] | French: | CARTE DOUBLE | [2006/26] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/26] | 02.03.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5223699 (FLYNN LORRAINE [US], et al); | [A]US5521966 (FRIEDES ALBERT [US], et al); | [A]US5578808 (TAYLOR DOUGLAS C [US]) [A] 1-16,21-25 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5991748 (TASKETT JOHN M [US]) [Y] 1-16,21-25 * abstract * * column 3, line 62 - column 5, line 45 *; | [A]US6032136 (BRAKE JR FRANCIS B [US], et al); | [Y]US6189787 (DORF ROBERT E [US]) [Y] 1-16,21-25 * abstract * * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 2 * * column 7, line 40 - column 8, line 55 * * column 10, line 55 - column 11, line 4 *; | [A]US2002022966 (HORGAN MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 1,3,5-8,10-15,18-20,23-25 * abstract * | International search | [X]US2001048023 (FITZMAURICE MARY ANN [US], et al) |