EP1550991 - RECURSIVE-REFLECTION DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON CARBIDE KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 11-19, Kohnan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8466 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states Nippon Carbide Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 11-19, Kohnan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8466 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIMURA, Ikuo 3700-5, Butsuden Uozu-shi, Toyama 937-0061 / JP | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03754025.9 | 08.10.2003 | [2005/27] | WO2003JP12873 | Priority number, date | JP20020295329 | 08.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002295329 | JP20020298352 | 11.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002298352 | JP20020298869 | 11.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002298869 | [2005/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004034357 | Date: | 22.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1550991 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G09F13/16 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
G08G1/017 (EP,US);
G09F13/16 (EP,KR,US);
B60Q1/56 (EP,US);
B60R13/10 (EP,US);
G02B5/045 (EP,US);
G02B5/136 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REKURSIV-REFLEXIONS-ANZEIGEEINRICHTUNG | [2005/27] | English: | RECURSIVE-REFLECTION DISPLAY DEVICE | [2005/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE A REFLEXION RECURSIVE | [2005/27] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2005 | Translation filed | 06.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 06.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 06.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 31.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/40] | 26.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/40] | Divisional application(s) | EP12000661.4 / EP2450870 | EP12000662.2 / EP2450871 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH01181083U ; | [A]JPH0843615 (NIPPON CARBIDE KOGYO KK); | [A]WO9635196 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [X]US5621571 (BANTLI HEINRICH [US], et al); | [A]JP2001033609 (NIPPON CARBIDE KOGYO KK); | [Y]JP2001151313 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]US6441551 (ABE HIDETOSHI [JP], et al) |