EP1552632 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR WIRELESS NETWORK CHANNEL MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/28] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR WIRELESS NETWORK CHANNEL MANAGEMENT | ||
[2018/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Extreme Networks, Inc. 6480 Via Del Oro San Jose, CA 95119 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2019/09] | For all designated states Extreme Networks, Inc. 6480 Via Del Oro San Jose, CA 95119 / US | ||
Former [2018/11] | For all designated states Extreme Networks, Inc. 6480 Via Del Oro San Jose, CA 95119 / US | ||
Former [2017/13] | For all designated states Extreme Networks, Inc. 145 Rio Robles San Jose, CA 95134 / US | ||
Former [2016/26] | For all designated states Symbol Technologies, LLC One Zebra Plaza Holtsville, NY 11742 / US | ||
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. One Symbol Plaza Holtsville, NY 11742 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARONY, Jacob 26 Talisman Drive Dix Hills, NY 11746 / US | 02 /
SEN, Moushumi 1B Sundale Apts. 55 Osborne Road Ulsoor, Bangalore 560042 / IN | 03 /
SAKODA, William 9 Woodchuck Lane East Setauket, NY 11733 / US | [2019/09] |
Former [2005/28] | 01 /
SHARONY, Jacob 26 Talisman Drive Dix Hills, NY 11746 / US | ||
02 /
SEN, Moushumi 1B Sundale Apts., 55 Osborne Road Ulsoor, Bangalore 560042 / IN | |||
03 /
SAKODA, William 9 Woodchuck Lane East Setauket, NY 11733 / US | Representative(s) | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/09] | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/22] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof, Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/28] | Golkowsky, Stefan Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 03754843.5 | 23.09.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003US29944 | Priority number, date | US20020253005 | 23.09.2002 Original published format: US 253005 | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004028054 | Date: | 01.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1552632 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1552632 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/14, H04L12/873, H04L12/863, H04L12/801, // H04W72/10 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
H04W28/14 (EP,US);
H04L47/50 (EP,US);
H04L47/522 (EP,US);
H04L47/527 (EP,US);
H04L47/6215 (EP,US);
H04L47/6265 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/33] | H04L12/56, H04J3/16 | ||
Former IPC [2005/28] | H04J3/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/09] |
Former [2005/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG DRAHTLOSER NETZWERKKANÄLE | [2018/40] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR WIRELESS NETWORK CHANNEL MANAGEMENT | [2018/39] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE VOIES DANS UN RÉSEAU RADIO | [2018/40] |
Former [2005/28] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG DRAHTLOSER NETZWERKKANûLE | ||
Former [2005/28] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR WIRELESS NETWORK CHANNEL MANAGEMENT | ||
Former [2005/28] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE GESTION DE VOIES DANS UN RESEAU RADIO | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 13.03.2015 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 23.04.2015 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 20.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2006 | 30.09.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2006 | 30.09.2009 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   10.03.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.09.2003 | AT | 27.02.2019 | CY | 27.02.2019 | CZ | 27.02.2019 | DK | 27.02.2019 | EE | 27.02.2019 | ES | 27.02.2019 | FI | 27.02.2019 | IT | 27.02.2019 | MC | 27.02.2019 | NL | 27.02.2019 | RO | 27.02.2019 | SE | 27.02.2019 | SI | 27.02.2019 | SK | 27.02.2019 | TR | 27.02.2019 | BG | 27.05.2019 | GR | 28.05.2019 | PT | 27.06.2019 | IE | 23.09.2019 | LU | 23.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
IE | 23.09.2019 | ||
LU | 23.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
IE | 23.09.2019 | ||
LU | 23.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
IE | 23.09.2019 | ||
LU | 23.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
LU | 23.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 27.02.2019 | |
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 27.02.2019 | |
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 27.02.2019 | |
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
PT | 27.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0124428 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-3,8 * page 9, line 18 - page 20, line 25 *; | [A]EP1180869 (UNIV TSINGHUA [CN], et al) [A] 1-3,8* paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038] *; | [A] - SHREEDHAR M ET AL, "Efficient Fair Queuing Using Deficit Round-Robin", IEEE / ACM TRANSACTIONS ON NETWORKING, IEEE / ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19960601), vol. 4, no. 3, doi:10.1109/90.502236, ISSN 1063-6692, XP011038992 [A] 1-3,8 * page 377, column Left, line 31 - line 46 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/90.502236 | International search | [Y]US5708656 (NONEMAN JOHN [US], et al); | [Y]US6212194 (HSIEH WEN-JAI [US]); | [YP]US2003023915 (CHOI SUNGHYUN [US]); | [XP]US2003120705 (CHEN JIAN-GUO [US], et al) | by applicant | WO0124428 |