EP1543425 - COMPUTER SYSTEM WITH INTEGRATED DIRECTORY AND PROCESSOR CACHE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Globalfoundries Inc. Maples Corporate Services Limited P.O. Box 309 Ugland House KY1-1104 Grand Cayman / KY | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states GlobalFoundries, Inc. Maple Corporate Services Limited P.O. Box 309 Ugland House Grand Cayman KY1-1104 / KY | ||
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. One AMD Place Mail Stop 68 P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US | ||
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC. One AMD Place, Mail Stop 68, P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale, California 94088-3453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONWAY, Patrick 556 Cherry Avenue Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | [2006/50] |
Former [2005/25] | 01 /
CONWAY, Patrick 973 Dolores Avenue Los Altos, CA 94024-6049 / US | Representative(s) | Wright, Hugh Ronald Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | Wright, Hugh Ronald Brookes Batchellor LLP, 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03754996.1 | 18.09.2003 | [2005/25] | WO2003US30880 | Priority number, date | US20020256318 | 27.09.2002 Original published format: US 256318 | [2005/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004029776 | Date: | 08.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1543425 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
G06F12/082 (EP,US);
G06F12/08 (KR);
G06F12/00 (KR);
G06F2212/2515 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/03] |
Former [2005/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RECHNERSYSTEM MIT INTEGRIERTEM VERZEICHNIS UND PROZESSORCACHESPEICHER | [2005/25] | English: | COMPUTER SYSTEM WITH INTEGRATED DIRECTORY AND PROCESSOR CACHE | [2005/25] | French: | SYSTEME INFORMATIQUE AVEC CACHE D'ANNUAIRE ET DE PROCESSEUR INTEGRE | [2005/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 03.11.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2002087778 (SCHOINAS IOANNIS T [US]) [X] 1-5,8-10 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0032]; figure 2 * [Y] 6,7; | [Y]US5410669 (BIGGS TERRY L [US], et al) [Y] 6,7 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 5 * |