EP1552215 - BENT PERIMETER LIGHTING AND METHOD FOR FABRICATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/28] | BENT PERIMETER LIGHTING AND METHOD FOR FABRICATING | ||
[2014/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sloanled, Inc. 1833 Portola Road Ventura, CA 93003 / US | [2005/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLOAN, Thomas, C. 1841 Camino de la Luz Santa Barbara, CA 93109 / US | 02 /
QUAAL, Bruce 4628 Student Street Ventura, CA 93003 / US | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Jennings, Michael John, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Jennings, Michael John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | ||
Former [2011/35] | Jennings, Michael John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | ||
Former [2005/28] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 03755023.3 | 30.09.2003 | [2014/45] | WO2003US31275 | Priority number, date | US20020414991P | 01.10.2002 Original published format: US 414991 P | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004031648 | Date: | 15.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1552215 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1552215 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F21S4/00 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
F21V33/006 (EP,US);
F21S4/26 (EP,US);
H05B45/00 (EP,US);
F21Y2103/10 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] | Title | German: | GEBOGENE LICHTLEISTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2014/45] | English: | BENT PERIMETER LIGHTING AND METHOD FOR FABRICATING | [2014/45] | French: | ECLAIRAGE PERIMITRIQUE INCURVE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ASSOCIE | [2014/45] |
Former [2005/28] | GEBOGENE LICHTLEISTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR IHRER HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2005/28] | BENT PERIMETER LIGHTING AND METHOD FOR FABRICATING | ||
Former [2005/28] | ECLAIRAGE PERIMITRIQUE INCURVE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ASSOCIE | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 28.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.12.2007 | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/42] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.08.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 02.08.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.08.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2003 | AT | 05.11.2014 | BE | 05.11.2014 | BG | 05.11.2014 | CY | 05.11.2014 | CZ | 05.11.2014 | DK | 05.11.2014 | EE | 05.11.2014 | ES | 05.11.2014 | FI | 05.11.2014 | IT | 05.11.2014 | MC | 05.11.2014 | RO | 05.11.2014 | SE | 05.11.2014 | SI | 05.11.2014 | SK | 05.11.2014 | TR | 05.11.2014 | GR | 06.02.2015 | PT | 05.03.2015 | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 30.09.2003 | |
AT | 05.11.2014 | ||
BG | 05.11.2014 | ||
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
TR | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 05.11.2014 | |
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 05.11.2014 | |
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | PT | 05.03.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE20117762U (SHINING BLICK ENTPR CO [TW]) [A] 1,37 * abstract * * claims 1,4 * * figure - *; | [A]DE20203824U (LIU CHUN MING [TW]) [A] 1,37 * abstract * * claims 1,2 * * figure 6 *; | [A]DE20119861U (SCHUETZ WINFRIED [DE]) [A] 1,37 * abstract * * claims 1,7,8 * | Examination | DE1265972 | US2964796 | US4433994 | by applicant | DE20117762U | DE20203824U | DE20119861U | US4433994 |