Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003243072 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0300882 | 28.05.2003 | SE0201617 | 29.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1513425 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2009 | B1 | EP1513425 | 16.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0300882 | 28.05.2003 | SE0201617 | 29.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE452553T | 15.01.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | SE0300882 | 28.05.2003 | SE0201617 | 29.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60330665D1 | 04.02.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | SE0300882 | 28.05.2003 | SE0201617 | 29.05.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03099055 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0201617 | 29.05.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE0201617D0 | 29.05.2002 | D0 | Priority number | Date | SE0201617 | 29.05.2002 |