EP1539850 - COMPOUNDS CONTAINING QUATERNARY CARBONS AND SILICON-CONTAINING GROUPS, MEDICAL DEVICES, AND METHODS. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis MN 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2008/35] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | ||
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENZ, Michael, E. 15410 Hematite Street NW Ramsey, MN 55303 / US | 02 /
HOBOT, Christopher, M. 40 Pleasant Lane W. Tonka Bay, MN 55331 / US | 03 /
SPARER, Randall, V. 13522 Gladiola Street NW Andover, MN 55304 / US | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03755831.9 | 16.09.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003US29153 | Priority number, date | US20020411725P | 17.09.2002 Original published format: US 411725 P | US20030490780P | 29.07.2003 Original published format: US 490780 P | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004026936 | Date: | 01.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1539850 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1539850 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/61, C08G18/62, A61N1/05 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
A61N1/05 (EP,US);
C08G18/61 (EP,US);
C08G18/6204 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN DIE QUARTERNÄRE KOHLSTOFFE UND SILIZIUMGRUPPEN ENTHALTEN, MEDIZINSICHE GERÄTE UND VERFAHREN | [2005/24] | English: | COMPOUNDS CONTAINING QUATERNARY CARBONS AND SILICON-CONTAINING GROUPS, MEDICAL DEVICES, AND METHODS. | [2005/24] | French: | COMPOSES CONTENANT DES CARBONES QUATERNAIRES, GROUPES CONTENANT UN SILICIUM, DISPOSITIFS MEDICAUX ET PROCEDES | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 17.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.02.2007 | 09.01.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 10.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 10.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 12.09.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 12.09.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.09.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.08.2008 | BE | 27.08.2008 | CY | 27.08.2008 | CZ | 27.08.2008 | DK | 27.08.2008 | EE | 27.08.2008 | FI | 27.08.2008 | IT | 27.08.2008 | NL | 27.08.2008 | RO | 27.08.2008 | SI | 27.08.2008 | SK | 27.08.2008 | TR | 27.08.2008 | IE | 16.09.2008 | LU | 16.09.2008 | CH | 30.09.2008 | LI | 30.09.2008 | MC | 30.09.2008 | BG | 27.11.2008 | GB | 27.11.2008 | SE | 27.11.2008 | GR | 28.11.2008 | ES | 08.12.2008 | PT | 27.01.2009 | HU | 28.02.2009 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CY | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
TR | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 16.09.2008 | ||
LU | 16.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
GB | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
HU | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CY | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 16.09.2008 | ||
LU | 16.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
GB | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
HU | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 16.09.2008 | ||
LU | 16.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
GB | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 16.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
GB | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 16.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
GB | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 16.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 16.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 16.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 16.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 27.08.2008 | |
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 27.08.2008 | |
ES | 08.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0661332 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 40 * page 3, line 10 - line 27 *; | [X]WO9850086 (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [X] 1,17,40,50 * page 6, line 3 - page 8, line 24 * * page 15, line 11 - page 16, line 18; examples 7-13,17-20; claims 1,9-13 *; | [A]EP0940405 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 40* page 3, line 21 - page 5, line 42; claim - *; | [X]US6420452 (GUNATILLAKE PATHIRAJA A [AU], et al) [X] 1,2,12,13,17,40,50,57,71,76 * column 1, line 11 - column 8, line 10; claims 1-48 * | by applicant | US4873308 | US5040544 | US5238006 | US5375609 | US5480421 | US5986034 | US6111052 | US6149678 |