EP1513932 - TRANSGENIC CLAWED FROG EMBRYOS AND USE THEREOF AS DETECTORS OF ENDOCRINE DISRUPTERS IN THE ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE -CNRS- 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states MUSEUM NATIONAL D'HISTOIRE NATURELLE 57, rue Cuvier 75231 Paris Cedex 05 / FR | [2015/28] |
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states MUSEUM NATIONAL D'HISTOIRE NATURELLE 57, rue Cuvier 75231 Paris Cedex 05 / FR | |||
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states MUSEUM NATIONAL D'HISTOIRE NATURELLE 43, Rue Cuvier 75231 Paris Cedex 05 / FR | |||
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMENEIX, Barbara 69, rue Broca F-75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
TURQUE, Nathalie 106, rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2005/11] | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03756011.7 | 27.05.2003 | [2005/11] | WO2003FR01598 | Priority number, date | FR20020006669 | 30.05.2002 Original published format: FR 0206669 | [2005/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03102176 | Date: | 11.12.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1513932 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1513932 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, A01K67/027, C12N15/85, G01N33/50, C12N5/10 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
C12N15/8509 (EP,US);
A01K67/0275 (EP,US);
G01N33/5014 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A01K2227/50 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0393 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/28] |
Former [2005/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | TRANSGENE XENOPUS EMBRYOS ZUR ERKENNUNG VON ENDOKRINEN UMWELTSTÖRUNGEN | [2005/11] | English: | TRANSGENIC CLAWED FROG EMBRYOS AND USE THEREOF AS DETECTORS OF ENDOCRINE DISRUPTERS IN THE ENVIRONMENT | [2005/11] | French: | EMBRYONS TRANSGÉNIQUES DE XÉNOPE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS POUR LA DÉTECTION DE PERTURBATEURS ENDOCRINIENS DANS L'ENVIRONNEMENT | [2015/01] |
Former [2005/11] | EMBRYONS TRANSGENIQUES DE XENOPE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS POUR LA DETECTION DE PERTURBATEURS ENDOCRINIENS DAN L ENVIRONNEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 21.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.11.2014 | 25.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.01.2008 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   24.06.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2003 | AT | 08.07.2015 | BG | 08.07.2015 | CY | 08.07.2015 | CZ | 08.07.2015 | DK | 08.07.2015 | EE | 08.07.2015 | ES | 08.07.2015 | FI | 08.07.2015 | IT | 08.07.2015 | MC | 08.07.2015 | NL | 08.07.2015 | RO | 08.07.2015 | SE | 08.07.2015 | SI | 08.07.2015 | SK | 08.07.2015 | TR | 08.07.2015 | GR | 09.10.2015 | PT | 09.11.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 27.05.2003 | |
AT | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
TR | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 27.05.2003 | |
AT | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 08.07.2015 | |
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 08.07.2015 | |
GR | 09.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5571722 (ROSSON REINHARDT A [US]) [Y] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5612184 (ROSSON REINHARDT A [US]) [Y] 33 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9303179 (BIO TECH RESOURCES [US]) [Y] 22-27 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1130086 (DEUTSCHES KREBSFORSCH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1180684 (UNIV HIROSHIMA PRESIDENT [JP]) [A] 22,24,27 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9830715 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5094944 (HAYES KENNETH R [US]) [A] 1,22 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9828971 (UNIV TECHNOLOGY CORP [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0188115 (FOND JEAN DAUSSET CEPH [FR], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [XY] - OOFUSA K, TOOI O, KASHIWAGI A, KASHIWAGI K, KONDO Y, WATANABE Y, SAWADA T, FUJIKAWA K, YOSHIZATO K., "Expression of thyroid hormone receptor betaA gene assayed by transgenic Xenopus laevis carrying its promoter sequences.", MOL CELL ENDOCRINOL, (20010705), vol. 181, no. 1-2, pages 97 - 110, XP002234275 [X] 1-6,11,13-18,24,27 * the whole document * [Y] 1-33 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0303-7207(01)00529-9 | [XY] - DE LUZE A, SACHS L, DEMENEIX B., "Thyroid hormone-dependent transcriptional regulation of exogenous genes transferred into Xenopus tadpole muscle in vivo.", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (199308), vol. 90, no. 15, pages 7322 - 7326, XP002253795 [X] 1-5,8,9,11,13-19 * the whole document * [Y] 11-33 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.90.15.7322 | [PXY] - SACHS LM, JONES PL, HAVIS E, ROUSE N, DEMENEIX BA, SHI YB., "Nuclear receptor corepressor recruitment by unliganded thyroid hormone receptor in gene repression during Xenopus laevis development.", MOL CELL BIOL., (200212), vol. 22, no. 24, pages 8527 - 8538, XP002253796 [PX] 1-5,8,9,11,13-19 * the whole document * [Y] 11-33 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.22.24.8527-8538.2002 | Examination | - ZOELLER R THOMAS ET AL, "Thyroid hormone, brain development, and the environment", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200206), Database accession no. PREV200200399959 | - FURLOW J DAVID ET AL, "In vitro and in vivo analysis of the regulation of a transcription factor gene by thyroid hormone during Xenopus laevis metamorphosis", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (199912), Database accession no. PREV200000049749 | - FOSTER ROSEMARY ET AL, "Multiple SW16-dependent cis-acting elements control SW14 transcription through the cell cycle", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1993), Database accession no. PREV199396040121 | - FURLOW, J.D. AND BROWN, D.D., "Xenopus laevis TH/bZIP B gene promoter region, and exon 1", GENBANK, Database accession no. AF192492 | - ERICA GIES, "Unhealthy Glow: Fluorescent Tadpoles Expose Chemical Contamination", SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN, (20130207), URL: http://www.scientificamerican.com/article/transgenic-tadpole-glows-to-reveal-chemical-contamination/ |