EP1549892 - REDUCED CARBON DIOXIDE EMISSION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING POWER FOR REFRIGERANT COMPRESSION AND ELECTRICAL POWER FOR A LIGHT HYDROCARBON GAS LIQUEFACTION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BP Corporation North America Inc. 4101 Winfield Road Warrenville, Illinois 60555 / US | [2005/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Richard, Jr. 4114 Spyglass Hills Drive Katy, TX 77450 / US | 02 /
WARD, Patrick, B. 24706 Mather Drive Katy, TX 77494 / US | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Hamer, Christopher K., et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | Hamer, Christopher K., et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03756884.7 | 29.09.2003 | [2005/27] | WO2003US30556 | Priority number, date | US20020414806P | 30.09.2002 Original published format: US 414806 P | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004031669 | Date: | 15.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1549892 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F25J1/02, F01K23/10, C10L3/10, F01D15/00, F02C6/10, F01K23/06, F02C6/18 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
C10L3/10 (EP,US);
C10L3/102 (EP,US);
F01D15/005 (EP,US);
F01K23/064 (EP,US);
F01K23/10 (EP,US);
F02C6/10 (EP,US);
F02C6/18 (EP,US);
F25J1/0022 (EP,US);
F25J1/0242 (EP,US);
F25J1/027 (EP,US);
F25J1/0274 (EP,US);
F25J1/0283 (EP,US);
F25J1/0287 (EP,US);
F05D2210/12 (EP,US);
F05D2220/72 (EP,US);
F05D2220/76 (EP,US);
F25J2205/60 (EP,US);
F25J2220/64 (EP,US);
F25J2220/66 (EP,US);
F25J2240/70 (EP,US);
F25J2240/82 (EP,US);
Y02E20/16 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/27] | F25J1/02, F01K23/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND METHODE ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG DER ANTRIEBSLEISTUNG FÜR DIE KÜHLMITTELVERDICHTUNG UND DER ELEKTRISCHEN ENERGIE ZUR VERFLÜSSIGUNG EINES LEICHTEN KOHLENWASSERSTOFFGASES MIT VERMINDERTER CO2 EMISSION | [2005/27] | English: | REDUCED CARBON DIOXIDE EMISSION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING POWER FOR REFRIGERANT COMPRESSION AND ELECTRICAL POWER FOR A LIGHT HYDROCARBON GAS LIQUEFACTION PROCESS | [2005/27] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE A FAIBLE TAUX D'EMISSION DE DIOXYDE DE CARBONE PERMETTANT DE FOURNIR DE L'ENERGIE POUR UNE COMPRESSION FRIGORIFIQUE ET DE L'ENERGIE ELECTRIQUE PARTAGEE POUR UN PROCESSUS DE LIQUEFACTION DES HYDROCARBURES LEGERS | [2005/27] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 05.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/42] | 04.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6248794 (GIESKES THOMAS [US]) [Y] 1-20 * column 4, line 43 - line 67 * * column 5, line 9 - line 20; figure 2 *; | [Y]WO9836038 (NORSKE STATS OLJESELSKAP [NO], et al) [Y] 1-20 * abstract *; | [A]WO0140725 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [A] 1,12,13 * page 2, line 18 - line 25 *; | [A]WO9733131 (NORSKE STATS OLJESELSKAP [NO], et al) [A] 8,16 * page 5, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US4566885 (HAAK FREDERIK W [NL]) [A] 7,20 * abstract *; | [A]US5689141 (KIKKAWA YOSHITSUGI [JP], et al) [A] 7,20 * column 7, line 15 - line 25; figure - *; | [A]US6272882 (HODGES DEREK WILLIAM [AU], et al) [A] 7,20 * column 3, line 63 - line 66; figure 1 * | [X] - HEINZ BAUER, "A novel Concept", HYDROCARBON ENGINEERING, (200205), pages 59 - 63, XP009025584 [X] 1-20 * page 62, paragraph 6; figure 5 * | Examination | - AVIDAN ET AL, "LNG LIQUEFACTION TECHNOLOGIES MOVE TOWARD GREATER EFFICIENCIES, LOWER EMISSIONS", OIL AND GAS JOURNAL, (20020818), XP001179182 |