EP1558535 - CRYSTALLISABLE GLASS AND THE USE THEREOF FOR PRODUCING EXTREMELY SOLID AND BREAK-RESISTANT GLASS-CERAMICS HAVING AN EASILY POLISHED SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schott AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [2005/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPRENGER, Dirk Auf der Langweid 47 55271 Stadecken-Elsheim / DE | 02 /
ZACHAU, Thilo Erlenweg 3 68642 Bürstadt-Riedrode / DE | 03 /
LIEBALD, Rainer Sandbergstrasse 4 64569 Nauheim / DE | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Naupliastrasse 110 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Fuchs Mehler Weiss & Fritzsche, Patentanwälte Naupliastrasse 110 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03757685.7 | 26.09.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003DE03227 | Priority number, date | DE2002145234 | 27.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10245234 | [2005/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004031089 | Date: | 15.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1558535 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C03C10/04, C03C10/08, C03C3/062, C03C3/068 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
C03C3/068 (EP,KR,US);
C03C10/00 (KR);
C03C10/0045 (EP,US);
C03C10/0054 (EP,US);
C03C3/062 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRISTALLISIERBARES GLAS UND SEINE VERWENDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER HOCHSTEIFEN, BRUCHFESTEN GLASKERAMIK MIT GUT POLIERBARER OBERFL CHE | [2005/31] | English: | CRYSTALLISABLE GLASS AND THE USE THEREOF FOR PRODUCING EXTREMELY SOLID AND BREAK-RESISTANT GLASS-CERAMICS HAVING AN EASILY POLISHED SURFACE | [2005/31] | French: | VERRE CRISTALLISABLE ET SON UTILISATION POUR PRODUIRE UNE VITROCERAMIQUE TRES RIGIDE, RESISTANTE A LA RUPTURE ET AYANT UNE SURFACE FACILE A POLIR | [2005/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 20.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/42] | 04.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0755901 (YAMAMURA GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * example -; claim - *; | [A]US5726108 (TAGUCHI TOMOYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP0858974 (HOYA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12* example -; claim - * | by applicant | US2920971 | EP0289903 | EP0552377 | JPH1179785 | EP0941973 | JP2000327365 | EP1067101 | EP1067102 |