EP1561311 - DYNAMIC LOAD DISTRIBUTION USING LOCAL STATE INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2014/24] |
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINER, Andreas Malminmäentie 2 C 5 FIN-02280 Espoo / FI | 02 /
BALANDIN, Sergey Alakiventie 7 D 55 FIN-00920 Helsinki / FI | [2006/46] |
Former [2005/32] | 01 /
HEINER, Andreas Malminmäentie 2 C 5 FIN-02280 Espoo / FI | ||
02 /
BALANDIN, Sergey Iso Roobertinkatu 46 B 36 FIN-00120 Helsinki / FI | Representative(s) | Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2012/40] |
Former [2005/32] | Helino, Timo, et al Papula Oy, P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 03758161.8 | 22.10.2003 | [2005/32] | WO2003FI00788 | Priority number, date | US20020286477 | 01.11.2002 Original published format: US 286477 | [2005/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004040858 | Date: | 13.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1561311 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1561311 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/707, H04L12/751 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
H04L45/10 (EP,US);
H04L45/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/32] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/32] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE LASTVERTEILUNG MITTELS LOKALER ZUSTANDSINFORMATION | [2005/32] | English: | DYNAMIC LOAD DISTRIBUTION USING LOCAL STATE INFORMATION | [2005/32] | French: | REPARTITION DE CHARGE DYNAMIQUE FAISANT APPEL A DES INFORMATIONS D'ETAT LOCALES | [2005/32] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 19.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 31.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.10.2003 | AT | 24.12.2014 | BE | 24.12.2014 | BG | 24.12.2014 | CY | 24.12.2014 | CZ | 24.12.2014 | DK | 24.12.2014 | EE | 24.12.2014 | ES | 24.12.2014 | FI | 24.12.2014 | IT | 24.12.2014 | MC | 24.12.2014 | NL | 24.12.2014 | PT | 24.12.2014 | RO | 24.12.2014 | SE | 24.12.2014 | SI | 24.12.2014 | SK | 24.12.2014 | TR | 24.12.2014 | GR | 25.03.2015 | [2018/37] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 22.10.2003 | |
AT | 24.12.2014 | ||
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
BG | 24.12.2014 | ||
CY | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
TR | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 24.12.2014 | |
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 24.12.2014 | |
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 24.12.2014 | |
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 24.12.2014 | |
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 24.12.2014 | |
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 24.12.2014 | |
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 24.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6098107 (NARVAEZ-GUARNIERI PAOLO [US], et al); | [A]EP1087576 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA]); | [A]US2002067693 (KODIALAM MURALIDHARAN S [US], et al); | [A]US2002103631 (FELDMANN ANJA [DE], et al); | [A]US2002147842 (BREITBART YURI J [US], et al) | Examination | EP1146768 | by applicant | EP1087576 | US2002147842 |