EP1554638 - METHOD FOR MONITORING AND ANALYZING A PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Outotec Oyj Riihitontuntie 7 02200 Espoo / FI | [2008/14] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states Liqum Paper OY Ohjelmakaari 1 40500 Jyväskylä / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAITINEN-VELLONEN, Sakari Kuokkasenmutka 10 FIN-40520 Jyväskylä / FI | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Helke, Kimmo Kalervo Kespat Oy P.O. Box 601 40101 Jyväskylä / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | Helke, Kimmo Kalervo Kespat Oy, P.O. Box 601 40101 Jyväskylä / FI | Application number, filing date | 03758164.2 | 23.10.2003 | [2005/29] | WO2003FI00791 | Priority number, date | FI20020001901 | 24.10.2002 Original published format: FI 20021901 | [2005/29] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004038524 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1554638 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1554638 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G05B21/00, G05B23/00, D21F11/00 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
G05B23/0213 (EP,US);
D21G9/0009 (EP,US);
G05B23/0221 (EP,US);
G05B23/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BERWACHEN UND ANALYSIEREN EINES PROZESSES | [2005/29] | English: | METHOD FOR MONITORING AND ANALYZING A PROCESS | [2005/29] | French: | PROCEDE DE SURVEILLANCE ET D'ANALYSE D'UN PROCESSUS | [2005/29] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2003 | Translation filed | 22.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 22.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 12.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 23.02.2011 | CY | 23.02.2011 | CZ | 23.02.2011 | EE | 23.02.2011 | HU | 23.02.2011 | IT | 23.02.2011 | NL | 23.02.2011 | SI | 23.02.2011 | SK | 23.02.2011 | TR | 23.02.2011 | GR | 24.05.2011 | GB | 23.10.2011 | LU | 23.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | FR | 02.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
TR | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
GB | 23.10.2011 | ||
LU | 23.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
GB | 23.10.2011 | ||
LU | 23.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
GB | 23.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
GB | 23.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | GR | 24.05.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3490689 (HART ROBERT H, et al); | [Y]US5825653 (HUOVILA JYRKI [FI], et al); | [Y]WO0175222 (LIQUM OY [FI], et al); | [Y]US2002052712 (VOSER ALEXANDRE [CH], et al); | [AP]WO03074784 (UNIV MANCHESTER [GB], et al) | by applicant | WO0175222 |