EP1534218 - MAKE-UP COMPOSITION FOR KERATIN FIBRES SUCH AS EYELASHES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states L'ORÉAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE LA POTERIE, Valérie 83, allée de la Belle Cordière F-77820 Le Châtelet-en-Brie / FR | 02 /
PAYS, Karl 2 Villa des Vignes 94410 Saint-Maurice / FR | 03 /
DAUBIGE, Thérèse 71, rue Véron 37420 Beaumont en Veron / FR | 04 /
STYCZEN, Patrice 21, allée de la Clairière F-91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR | 05 /
BICHON, Yohann 4 Domaine du Château Gaillard 94700 MAISONS-ALFORT / FR | [2006/49] |
Former [2006/48] | 01 /
DE LA POTERIE, Valérie 83, allée de la Belle Cordière F-77820 Le Châtelet-en-Brie / FR | ||
02 /
PAYS, Karl 2 Villa des Vignes 94410 Saint-Maurice / FR | |||
03 /
DAUBIGE, Thérèse 71, rue Véron 37420 Beaumont en Veron / FR | |||
04 /
STYCZEN, Patrice 21, allée de la Clairière F-91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR | |||
05 /
BICHON, Yohann 116, rue de Patay F-75013 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2005/22] | 01 /
DE LA POTERIE, Valérie 83, allée de la Belle Cordière F-77820 Le Châtelet-en-Brie / FR | ||
02 /
PAYS, Karl 18, rue du Père Mazurié F-94550 Chevilly-Larue / FR | |||
03 /
DAUBIGE, Thérèse 455, Grande Rue F-77480 Mousseaux les Bray / FR | |||
04 /
STYCZEN, Patrice 21, allée de la Clairière F-91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR | |||
05 /
BICHON, Yohann 116, rue de Patay F-75013 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Le Coupanec, Pascale A.M.P. Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | Le Coupanec, Pascale Nony & Associés 3, rue de Penthièvre F-78008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03758215.2 | 06.08.2003 | [2005/22] | WO2003FR02479 | Priority number, date | FR20020011104 | 06.09.2002 Original published format: FR 0211104 | FR20020011096 | 06.09.2002 Original published format: FR 0211096 | FR20020011097 | 06.09.2002 Original published format: FR 0211097 | FR20020012097 | 30.09.2002 Original published format: FR 0212097 | [2005/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004022009 | Date: | 18.03.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1534218 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1534218 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/31, A61K8/37, A61K8/81, A61K8/88, A61K8/92, A61Q1/10 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
A61K8/88 (EP,US);
A61K8/31 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K8/8141 (EP,US);
A61K8/92 (EP,US);
A61K8/922 (EP,US);
A61Q1/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/22] | A61K7/032 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHMINKE FÜR KERATINFASER, INSBESONDERE FÜR WIMPER | [2005/22] | English: | MAKE-UP COMPOSITION FOR KERATIN FIBRES SUCH AS EYELASHES | [2005/22] | French: | COMPOSITION DE MAQUILLAGE DES FIBRES KERATINIQUES NOTAMMENT DES FIBRES KERATINIQUES COMME LES CILS | [2005/22] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 22.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.03.2009 | 18.03.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.12.2009 | CY | 16.12.2009 | CZ | 16.12.2009 | DK | 16.12.2009 | EE | 16.12.2009 | FI | 16.12.2009 | IE | 16.12.2009 | NL | 16.12.2009 | RO | 16.12.2009 | SE | 16.12.2009 | SI | 16.12.2009 | SK | 16.12.2009 | TR | 16.12.2009 | BG | 16.03.2010 | GR | 17.03.2010 | PT | 16.04.2010 | HU | 17.06.2010 | GB | 06.08.2010 | IT | 06.08.2010 | LU | 06.08.2010 | ES | 07.08.2010 | BE | 31.08.2010 | CH | 31.08.2010 | LI | 31.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
HU | 17.06.2010 | ||
GB | 06.08.2010 | ||
IT | 06.08.2010 | ||
LU | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 07.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
HU | 17.06.2010 | ||
GB | 06.08.2010 | ||
IT | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 07.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/51] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
GB | 06.08.2010 | ||
IT | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 07.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
GB | 06.08.2010 | ||
IT | 06.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
IT | 06.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
IT | 06.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 16.12.2009 | |
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 16.12.2009 | |
SE | 16.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH10139631 ; | [XY]WO9112793 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-29,34-41 * page 1, line 23 - page 1, line 5 * * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 31 * * example - * * page 4, line 26 * [Y] 30-33; | [DX]EP0667146 (OREAL [FR]) [DX] 1-33 * examples 1-3 * * page 5, line 40 - page 6, line 40 *; | [XY]US5480632 (ORR CARL C [US], et al) [X] 1-29,34-41 * column 1, line 45 - column 3, line 5 * * example 1 * * column 3, line 15 * [Y] 30-33; | [X]FR2726467 (REVLON CONSUMER PROD CORP [US]) [X] 1-29,41 * example 2 *; | [X]US5783176 (MEIRING UTA [DE], et al) [X] 1-29 * example 15 *; | [X]EP1029897 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-29,41 * example 6 *; | [X]WO0056280 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-29,41 * tables 4-6 *; | [A]WO0057844 (OREAL [FR], et al) [A] * page 8, line 17 - line 29 *; | [XY]EP1201221 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-29,34-41 * example 3 * * paragraphs [0010] , [0049] , [0109] , [0111] * [Y] 30-33 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10139631 A 19980526 (KOKURIYUUDOU:KK;NIPPON SHIKIZAI KOGYO KENKYUSHO:KK) [X] 1-29,41 * abstract * |