EP1557016 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR CHANNEL ESTIMATION IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IPWireless, Inc. 1001 Bayhill Drive, 2nd Floor San Bruno, CA 94066 / US | [2008/04] |
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states IPWireless, Inc. 1001 Bayhill Drive, 2nd Floor San Bruno, CA 94066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DARWOOD, Peter, Bruce 78 Forres Road Crookes Sheffield S10 1WE / GB | 02 /
JONES, Alan, Edward 21 Petty Lane Derry Hill Wiltshire SN11 9QY / GB | [2005/30] | Representative(s) | Wray, Antony John, et al Optimus Patents Limited Peak Hill House Steventon Basingstoke, Hampshire RG25 3AZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | Wray, Antony John, et al Optimus The Strategic Patent Service Grove House Lutyens Close - Chineham Court Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | ||
Former [2005/30] | Jepsen, Rene Eltima Consulting Grove House, Lutyens Close Chineham Court Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | Application number, filing date | 03758356.4 | 24.10.2003 | [2005/30] | WO2003GB04587 | Priority number, date | GB20020024757 | 24.10.2002 Original published format: GB 0224757 | [2005/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004039098 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1557016 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1557016 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/02 | [2005/30] | CPC: |
H04L7/042 (EP,US);
H04L25/0204 (GB);
H04L25/0226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR KANALSCHÄTZUNG IN EINEM FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2005/30] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR CHANNEL ESTIMATION IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2005/30] | French: | PROCEDE ET AGENCEMENT PERMETTANT D'EFFECTUER UNE ESTIMATION DE VOIE DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2005/30] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 08.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.01.2008 | BE | 23.01.2008 | CH | 23.01.2008 | CY | 23.01.2008 | CZ | 23.01.2008 | DK | 23.01.2008 | EE | 23.01.2008 | FI | 23.01.2008 | LI | 23.01.2008 | NL | 23.01.2008 | RO | 23.01.2008 | SI | 23.01.2008 | SK | 23.01.2008 | TR | 23.01.2008 | BG | 23.04.2008 | SE | 23.04.2008 | GR | 24.04.2008 | PT | 23.06.2008 | HU | 24.07.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
TR | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
HU | 24.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
HU | 24.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 23.01.2008 | |
LI | 23.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5627823 (PILLEKAMP KLAUS-DIETER [DE]) [A] 18 * column 1, line 24 - column 2, line 3 *; | [A]EP0827295 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 18 * column 1, paragraph 1 - column 2 *; | [XY]US2002126220 (WILSON JOHN NICHOLAS [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,8,9,15-18,20-22 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0058] * [Y] 3-7,10-14; | [A]WO02082705 (LINKAIR COMM INC [US], et al) [A] 18 * page 15, line 18 - page 16, line 9 *; | [Y] - STEINER B ET AL, "OPTIMUM AND SUBOPTIMUM CHANNEL ESTIMATION FOR THE UPLINK OF CDMA MOBILE RADIO SYSTEMS WITH JOINT DETECTION", EUROPEAN TRANSACTIONS ON TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND RELATED TECHNOLOGIES, AEI, MILANO, IT, (1994), vol. 5, no. 1, ISSN 1120-3862, pages 39 - 50, XP000445714 [Y] 3-7,10-14 * page 42, column R, paragraph 2 - page 45, column L, paragraph 1 * | [Y] - MING LEI ET AL, "Channel estimation based on Midamble in UTRA-TDD system", PROCEEDING OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TELECOMMUNICATIONS, ICT 2002 - INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TELECOMMUNICATIONS, BEIJING, CHINA, 23-26 JUNE 2002, 2002, Beijing, China, Publishing House of Electronics Industry, China, pages 434 - 438 vol.2, XP008028023 [Y] 3-7,10-14 * the whole document * | [A] - HOSUR S ET AL, "Design of cyclically permutable codes for PN code acquisition in WCDMA TDD mode", IEEE 52ND VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE (CAT. NO.00CH37152), 2000, Piscataway, NJ, USA, IEEE, USA, (20000924), ISBN 0-7803-6507-0, pages 581 - 587 vol.2, XP010525450 [A] 1-18,20-22 * the whole document * | [A] - KOUKOURLIS S S ET AL, "On the capacity of an FFH-CDMA packet radio network", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BROADCASTING, MARCH 1995, USA, vol. 41, no. 1, ISSN 0018-9316, pages 17 - 22, XP002272652 [A] 1-18,20-22 * page 17, paragraph 2 - page 18, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/11.372017 |