EP1567181 - METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF HELICOBACTER PYLORI-ASSOCIATED DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VECTA LTD. 12 Hamada Street, Beit Tamar Rehovot 76703 / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states VECTA LTD. 12 Hamada Street, Beit Tamar Rehovot 76703 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLOZMAN, Sabina 41 Sapir Street Rehovot 76227 / IL | [2005/47] |
Former [2005/44] | 01 /
GLOZMAN, Sabina U1 Supit Street Rehovot 76227 / IL | ||
Former [2005/35] | 01 /
GLOZMAN, Sabina 19B/8 Max Nordaw Street 76247 Rehovot / IL | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03758376.2 | 09.10.2003 | [2005/35] | WO2003IB04453 | Priority number, date | IL20020152289 | 14.10.2002 Original published format: IL 15228902 | [2005/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004034957 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1567181 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/22, A61K38/07, A61P31/04, A61P1/04, A61P35/00, // (A61K38/22),(A61K31/00, 38:07) | [2006/15] | CPC: |
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61K38/2207 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/2207, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/35] | A61K38/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HELICOBACTER PYLORI-ASSOZIIERTEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2005/35] | English: | METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF HELICOBACTER PYLORI-ASSOCIATED DISORDERS | [2005/35] | French: | METHODES DE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES ASSOCIES A L'HELICOBACTERE PYLORI | [2005/35] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 25.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/43] | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]WO9965513 (CHOWERS MICHAL Y [IL], et al) [DX] 6,7,10 * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 15; claims 1,6-9 * * page 6, line 4 - line 6 * * page 9, line 18 - line 25 * * page 13, line 2 - line 12 *; | [DX]WO0122985 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [DX] 1-5,8,9 * page 2, line 7 - line 14; claims 1-8 * * page 10, line 3 - line 17 * * page 11, line 2 - line 12 * * page 12, line 24 - line 26 * * page 14, line 4 - line 5 * * page 11, line 21 - line 23 *; | [X]US2001020005 (CHOWERS MICHAL Y [IL], et al) [X] 6,7,10 * page 1, column R, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4; claims 1,6-9 * * page 4, column R, paragraph 2 *; | [PA] - CHOWERS MICHAL YAEL ET AL, "A defined human gastrin sequence stimulates the growth of Helicobacter pylori .", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY LETTERS, (2002 DEC 17) 217 (2) 231-6. JOURNAL CODE: 7705721. ISSN: 0378-1097., (200212), XP008054883 [PA] 6,7,10 * page 233, column R, paragraph 1 - page 234, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 235, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1574-6968.2002.tb11480.x | [DA] - M.Y. CHOWERS ET AL, "HUMAN GASTRIN: A HELICOBACTER PYLORI-SPECIFIC GROWTH FACTOR", GASTROENTEROLOGY, SAUNDERS, PHILADELPHIA, PA,, US, (199911), vol. 117, no. 5, ISSN 0016-5085, pages 1113 - 1118, XP000857804 [DA] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0016-5085(99)70396-3 | [A] - CHOWERS, M. Y. [REPRINT AUTHOR] ET AL, "Characterization of the interaction between H. pylori and human gastrin .", ABSTRACTS OF THE INTERSCIENCE CONFERENCE ON ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, VOL. 40, PP. 42. PRINT. MEETING INFO.: 40TH INTERSCIENCE CONFERENCE ON ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY. TORONTO, ONTARIO, CANADA. SEPTEMBER 17-20, 2000. INTERSC, (2000), XP008054888 [A] 6,7,10 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO0122985 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) |