EP1582019 - CALIBRATION OF SIGNAL STRENGTH MEASUREMENTS IN A CELLULAR COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2008 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2010 | Change - representative | published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2008/08] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWARZ, Uwe Lehtikuusentie 16 FIN-02880 Veikkola / FI | 02 /
KORPELA, Sari Bredankuja 7 G 25 FIN-02700 Kauniainen / FI | [2006/50] |
Former [2005/40] | 01 /
SCHWARZ, Uwe Mannistontie 12G4 FIN-02880 Veikkola / FI | ||
02 /
KORPELA, Sari Bredankuja 7 G 25 FIN-02700 Kauniainen / FI | Representative(s) | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2005/40] | Slingsby, Philip Roy Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 03758412.5 | 22.10.2003 | [2005/40] | WO2003IB04718 | Priority number, date | US20020306839 | 29.11.2002 Original published format: US 306839 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004051895 | Date: | 17.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1582019 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/00 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
H04B17/21 (EP,US);
H04B17/26 (EP,US);
H04B17/309 (EP,US);
H04B17/318 (EP,US);
H04W36/008375 (EP,US);
H04B17/327 (EP,US);
H04W36/08 (EP,US);
H04W36/304 (EP,US);
H04W48/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KALIBRIERUNG VON SIGNALSTÄRKEMESSUNGEN IN EINEM MOBILEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2005/40] | English: | CALIBRATION OF SIGNAL STRENGTH MEASUREMENTS IN A CELLULAR COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM | [2005/40] | French: | ETALONNAGE DES MESURES DE LA PUISSANCE D'UN SIGNAL DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATIONS CELLULAIRE | [2005/40] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 14.03.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5970394 (ARPEE JOHN E [US], et al); | [Y]US5978675 (NIEMELAE KARI [FI]); | [Y]US6272325 (WIEDEMAN ROBERT A [US], et al) |