EP1554067 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING WRINKLE FORMATION IN DEEP DRAWING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states NEDERLANDSE ORGANISATIE VOOR TOEGEPAST-NATUURWETENSCHAPPELIJK ONDERZOEK TNO Schoemakerstraat 97, P.O. Box 60680 2628 VK Delft / NL | ||
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states NEDERLANDSE ORGANISATIE VOOR TOEGEPAST-NATUURWETENSCHAPPELIJK ONDERZOEK TNO Schoemakerstraat 97, P.O. Box 60680 2628 VK Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLT, Pieter, Jan Basilicumhof 31 NL-1115 NL Duivendrecht / NL | 02 /
GUNNINK, Jan, Willem Broekmolenweg 1 NL-2289 BE Rijswijk / NL | 03 /
VAN LEEUWEN, Jacobus, Franciscus, Cosmas Marconilaan 129 NL-5612 HR Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
DE NOOY, Margriet Windevlindestraat 92 NL-5641 DR Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
WERKHOVEN, Robert-Jan Bart de Ligtstraat 12 NL-5671 DH Nuenen / NL | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2005/29] | Winckels, J.H.F., Mr. Ir., et al Vereenigde, Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 03759078.3 | 23.10.2003 | [2005/29] | WO2003NL00720 | Priority number, date | NL20021021738 | 24.10.2002 Original published format: NL 1021738 | [2005/29] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004037460 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1554067 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1554067 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B21D24/14, B21D22/21 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
B21D22/21 (EP,US);
B21D24/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM REDUZIEREN VON FALTENBILDUNG BEIM TIEFZIEHEN | [2005/29] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING WRINKLE FORMATION IN DEEP DRAWING | [2005/29] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR REDUIRE LA FORMATION DE PLIS DANS UNE OPERATION D'EMBOUTISSAGE PROFOND | [2005/29] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2004 | Translation filed | 25.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 22.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.09.2008 | CY | 17.09.2008 | CZ | 17.09.2008 | DK | 17.09.2008 | EE | 17.09.2008 | FI | 17.09.2008 | RO | 17.09.2008 | SI | 17.09.2008 | SK | 17.09.2008 | TR | 17.09.2008 | IE | 23.10.2008 | LU | 23.10.2008 | CH | 31.10.2008 | LI | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | BG | 17.12.2008 | SE | 17.12.2008 | GR | 18.12.2008 | ES | 28.12.2008 | PT | 17.02.2009 | HU | 18.03.2009 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
CY | 17.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
TR | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 23.10.2008 | ||
LU | 23.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
HU | 18.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
CY | 17.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 23.10.2008 | ||
LU | 23.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
HU | 18.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 23.10.2008 | ||
LU | 23.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 23.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 23.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 23.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2525514 (LUWA AG); | [X]US4470287 (ANTONOV EVGENY A [SU], et al) [X] 8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0312809 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 8 * the whole document *; | [DX]DE4038864 (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM FUER UMFORM [DE]) [DX] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0703018 (MUELLER WEINGARTEN MASCHF [DE]) [X] 8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0806256 (MUELLER WEINGARTEN MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1,8 * the whole document * |