EP1551406 - USE OF INDOLYL DERIVATIVES FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A MEDICAMENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF ALLERGIC RHINITIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNFORD, Paul, J. 425 south Rios Avenue Solano Beach, CA 92075 / US | 02 /
EDWARDS, James, P. 8723 Hesby Court San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 03 /
KARLSSON, Lars 336 Fern Glen La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 04 /
LEUNG, Wai-Ping 12707 Brubaker Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 05 /
THURMOND, Robin, L. 1465 Guizot Street San Diego, CA 92107 / US | 06 /
WEI, Jianmei 12516 Senda Panacea San Diego, CA 92129 / US | [2007/01] |
Former [2005/28] | 01 /
DUNFORD, Paul, J. 4153 1st Avenue San Diego, CA 92103 / US | ||
02 /
EDWARDS, James, P. 8723 Hesby Court San Diego, CA 92129 / US | |||
03 /
KARLSSON, Lars 336 Fern Glen La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | |||
04 /
LEUNG, Wai-Ping 12707 Brubaker Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
05 /
THURMOND, Robin, L. 1465 Guizot Street San Diego, CA 92107 / US | |||
06 /
WEI, Jianmei 12516 Senda Panacea San Diego, CA 92129 / US | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/28] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03759226.8 | 05.09.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003US27990 | Priority number, date | US20020408579P | 06.09.2002 Original published format: US 408579 P | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004022061 | Date: | 18.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1551406 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/496, A61P37/08, C07D401/12 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
A61K31/496 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/553 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D209/42 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 05.04.2005 | LV | 05.04.2005 | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON INDOLYLDERIVATE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ARZNEIMITTELN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ALLERGISCHEN RHINITIS | [2005/28] | English: | USE OF INDOLYL DERIVATIVES FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A MEDICAMENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF ALLERGIC RHINITIS | [2005/28] | French: | UTILISATION DES DERIVES DE L'INDOLYL POUR LA PREPARATION D'UN MEDICAMENT POUR LETRAITEMENT DE L'ALLERGIE RHINITIS | [2005/28] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 19.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/37] | 24.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO02072548 (ORTHO MCNEIL PHARM INC [US]) [PX] 1-26 * page 7, lines 27-33 * * page 28, lines 5-9 * * claims 36-38 * * examples 1-76 *; | [PX]WO03004480 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [PX] 1-5,7,10,12,16 * See compounds 314 and 315 *;; claims 41,55 *; | [A]EP0624575 (ADIR [FR]) [A] 1 * example 35; claims 1,12 *; | [A]EP0324431 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1,11,12 * * page 2, line 14 *; | [A]WO0246170 (SIGNAL PHARM INC [US]) [A] 1 * See page 147, compound 24-37 * * claims 1,3 * * page 190, line 15 * |