EP1573975 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ENCAPSULATING PACKETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAYTHEON COMPANY 870 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states RAYTHEON COMPANY 870 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | ||
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states RAYTHEON COMPANY 870 Winter Street Waltham MA 02451 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSENGARD, Phillip, I. 20986 Flatboat Court Sterling, VA 20165-7443 / US | 02 /
KRUNZ, Marwan, M. 6601 East Ghost Flower Drive Tucson, AZ 85750 / US | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell, 138 Hagley Road, Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03759603.8 | 01.10.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003US30957 | Priority number, date | US20020322120 | 17.12.2002 Original published format: US 322120 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004062203 | Date: | 22.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1573975 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1573975 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/46 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
H04L47/2441 (EP,KR,US);
H04L12/4633 (EP,KR,US);
H04L12/5601 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/10 (EP,US);
H04L47/2416 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/245 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/283 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/36 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/50 (EP,US);
H04L47/56 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/621 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/6215 (EP,KR,US);
H04L49/90 (EP,US);
H04L49/9023 (EP);
H04L49/9047 (EP,KR,US);
H04L2012/561 (EP,KR,US);
H04L2012/5649 (EP,KR,US);
H04L2012/5651 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR EINKAPSELUNG VON PAKETEN | [2005/37] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ENCAPSULATING PACKETS | [2005/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'ENCAPSULATION DES PAQUETS | [2006/50] |
Former [2005/37] | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'ENCAPSULATION DE PAQUETS | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 23.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.06.2007 | BE | 06.06.2007 | CH | 06.06.2007 | CY | 06.06.2007 | CZ | 06.06.2007 | DK | 06.06.2007 | EE | 06.06.2007 | FI | 06.06.2007 | IT | 06.06.2007 | LI | 06.06.2007 | NL | 06.06.2007 | RO | 06.06.2007 | SI | 06.06.2007 | SK | 06.06.2007 | TR | 06.06.2007 | BG | 06.09.2007 | SE | 06.09.2007 | GR | 07.09.2007 | ES | 17.09.2007 | IE | 01.10.2007 | LU | 01.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | PT | 06.11.2007 | HU | 07.12.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CY | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
EE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
IT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
RO | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
IE | 01.10.2007 | ||
LU | 01.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CY | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
EE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
IT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
RO | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
IE | 01.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
EE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
IT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
RO | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
IE | 01.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
IT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
RO | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
IE | 01.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
IT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
RO | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
IT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
IT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CH | 06.06.2007 | |
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 17.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5537408 (BRANSTAD MARK W [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,12-18,21,25,26,29-31 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 60 * * column 5, line 65 - column 7, line 30 * * column 8, line 10 - line 30 * * column 10, line 15 - line 35 * * column 11, line 20 - line 40 * * column 12, line 10 - line 40 *; | [A]WO9847293 (TELIA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,13,26,30,31* page 12, paragraph 3 - page 13, paragraph 1 *; | [A]EP1178635 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1-4,11,13-17,24,26,27,30,31 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0051] * |