EP1560535 - BONE PLATE ASSEMBLY PROVIDED WITH SCREW LOCKING MECHANISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blackstone Medical, Inc. 90 Brookdale Drive Springfield, MA 01104 / US | For all designated states Lombardo, Alan 14 Round Hill Road Kinnelon, NJ 07470 / US | For all designated states Evans, David Edgar 4 Duncan Place Nutley, NJ 07110 / US | [2005/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOMBARDO, Alan 14 Round Hill Road Kinnelon, NJ 07470 / US | 02 /
EVANS, David, Edgar 4 Duncan Place Nutley, NJ 07110 / US | [2005/32] | Representative(s) | Lockey, Robert Alexander, et al Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Lockey, Robert Alexander, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/38] | Lockey, Robert Alexander Forrester & Boehmert Chamberlain House Paradise Place Birmingham B3 3HP / GB | ||
Former [2006/51] | Stephen, Robert John, et al Olswang 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | ||
Former [2005/32] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03759643.4 | 01.10.2003 | [2005/32] | WO2003US31099 | Priority number, date | US20020421819P | 28.10.2002 Original published format: US 421819 P | [2005/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004039236 | Date: | 13.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1560535 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/80 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
A61B17/8042 (EP,US);
A61B17/8615 (US);
A61B17/8047 (EP,US);
A61B17/8052 (EP,US);
A61B17/8605 (EP,US);
A61B17/863 (EP,US);
A61B17/8685 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KNOCHENPLATTENANORDNUNG MIT SCHRAUBENSICHERUNGSMECHANISMUS | [2005/32] | English: | BONE PLATE ASSEMBLY PROVIDED WITH SCREW LOCKING MECHANISMS | [2005/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LAME OSSEUSE POURVU DE MECANISMES DE VERROUILLAGE DE VIS | [2005/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 20.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/47] | 24.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2007 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.08.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 08.08.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.08.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0599640 (CODMAN & SHURTLEFF [US]) [A] 14,18,19 * abstract *; | [A]US5725588 (ERRICO JOSEPH P [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * abstract *; | [A]US5931838 (VITO RAYMOND P [US]) [A] 14,15 * abstract *; | [A]FR2792185 (NUMEDIC [FR]) [A] 1,10 * abstract *; | [XA]WO0149191 (SPINAL CONCEPTS INC [US]) [X] 15-17,22 * abstract * [A] 1,10,14; | [A]EP1169971 (STRYKER SPINE SA [FR]) [A] 1,10* abstract * | International search | [X]US6224602 (HAYES KYLE [US]); | [X]US6235033 (BRACE MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US2002151899 (BAILEY KIRK J [US], et al); | [XP]US6613053 (COLLINS SIMON NICHOLAS [GB], et al) | by applicant | US6413259 |