EP1547389 - DYNAMIC VIDEO ANNOTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAYTHEON COMPANY 870 Winter Street Waltham MA 02451-1449 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states RAYTHEON COMPANY 870 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451-1449 / US | ||
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states HRL LABORATORIES, LLC 3011 Malibu Canyon Road Malibu, CA 90265-4799 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AZUMA, Ronald, T. 910 19th Street 107 Santa Monica, CA 90403 / US | 02 /
DAILY, Mike 60 Inverness Rd. Thousand Oaks, CA 91361 / US | 03 /
NEELY III, Howard 1603 Dewey Street Santa Monica, Ca 90405 / US | 04 /
MARTIN, Kevin, R. 549 Bath Ct. Oak Park, CA 91377-4800 / US | [2006/51] |
Former [2005/26] | 01 /
AZUMA, Ronald, T. 910 19th Street 107 Santa Monica, CA 90403 / US | ||
02 /
DAILY, Mike 60 Inverness Rd. Thousand Oaks, CA 91361 / US | |||
03 /
NEELY III, Howard 1280 Bryant Place Manhattan Beach, CA 90266 / US | |||
04 /
MARTIN, Kevin, R. 549 Bath Ct. Oak Park, CA 91377-4800 / US | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell, 138 Hagley Road, Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03759713.5 | 02.10.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003US31488 | Priority number, date | US20020263925 | 02.10.2002 Original published format: US 263925 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004032516 | Date: | 15.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1547389 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
H04N21/658 (EP,US);
H04N21/234318 (EP,US);
H04N21/2743 (EP,US);
H04N21/47205 (EP,US);
H04N21/4788 (EP,US);
H04N7/17318 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE ANMERKUNG FÜR VIDEO | [2005/26] | English: | DYNAMIC VIDEO ANNOTATION | [2005/26] | French: | ANNOTATION VIDEO DYNAMIQUE | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 30.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/47] | 04.06.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.08.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/47] | Appeal following examination | 14.08.2010 | Appeal received No. T1798/10 | 24.08.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | EP10161907.0 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 05.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0043899 (HOTV INC [US]) [A] 17* abstract *; | [A]US6215498 (FILO ANDREW S [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5,15,21 * column 17, line 21 - column 18, line 65; figures 7,10,11 *; | [X]EP1107596 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,7-9,11-13,15,18,20-22 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP1111926 (WEBTV NETWORKS INC [US]) [X] 1-16,18,20-22 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1-7 *; | [X]WO0232531 (NEARLIFE INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9,11,12,14-22 * page 4, line 22 - page 10, line 27; figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO0237943 (WAVEXPRESS INC [US]) [X] 1-8,12-16,18-22 * page 2, line 22 - page 11, line 4; figures 1-8 *; | [XA]US2002106623 (MOEHRLE ARMIN [US]) [X] 15,16,18,21,22 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0015]; figures 1-4 * [A] 1-3,5,6 |