EP1516202 - METHOD FOR ELIMINATING DUMMY OBJECTS IN SHORT-RANGE PULSE RADAR SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eckel, Matthias Caecilienstrasse 4 60433 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
Hoetzel, Juergen Reitfeldstrasse 9 61197 Florstadt / DE | [2005/12] | Application number, filing date | 03759811.7 | 02.04.2003 | [2005/12] | WO2003DE01082 | Priority number, date | DE2002126576 | 14.06.2002 Original published format: DE 10226576 | [2005/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03107034 | Date: | 24.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1516202 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/20 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
G01S13/20 (EP,US);
G01S13/931 (EP,US);
G01S7/288 (EP,US);
G01S7/2926 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2005/40] |
Former [2005/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ELIMINIERUNG VON SCHEINOBJEKTEN BEI NAHBEREICHS-PULS-RADAR-SENSOREN | [2005/12] | English: | METHOD FOR ELIMINATING DUMMY OBJECTS IN SHORT-RANGE PULSE RADAR SENSORS | [2005/12] | French: | PROCEDE POUR ELIMINER DES OBJETS VIRTUELS AU NIVEAU DE DETECTEURS DE RADAR A IMPULSIONS COURTES DISTANCES | [2005/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 28.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/13] | 03.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1601714 (C F T H) [A] 1 * page 1, column L, line 1 - page 5, column L, line 35; figures 1-4 *; | [XA]EP0291337 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 2, column 2, line 40 - page 7, column 11, line 12; figures 1-12 * [A] 2-4; | [AD]WO9847022 (MICROTEK INT INC [TW], et al); | [AD]RU2141151 (NIJA I RADIOEHLEKTRONIKI, et al) |