EP1515879 - ANTI-THEFT IMMOBILIZATION SYSTEM FOR TRUCKS AND/OR HANGERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states I-Protect ApS St. Fjelstervangsvej 22, Fjelstervang 6933 Kibaek / DK | [2005/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEPSEN, Henrik Skibbrogade 25, 1. tv. Dk-6100 Haderslev / DK | 02 /
WILLATZEN, Per Sondergade 5a DK-6520 Toftlund / DK | 03 /
BARFOD, Jesper, Malm Petersborgvej 4 DK-3120 Dronningmolle / DK | [2005/12] | Representative(s) | Inspicos P/S Agern Allé 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | Inspicos A/S Böge Allé 5, P.O. Box 45 2970 Hörsholm / DK | Application number, filing date | 03759880.2 | 13.06.2003 | [2005/12] | WO2003DK00396 | Priority number, date | DK20020000892 | 13.06.2002 Original published format: DK 200200892 | [2005/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03106232 | Date: | 24.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1515879 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1515879 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/08 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
B60R25/102 (EP);
B60R25/08 (EP);
B60R25/1004 (EP);
B60R25/2009 (EP);
B60R25/25 (EP);
B60R25/257 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIEBSTAHLSCHUTZ-WEGFAHRSPERRSYSTEM FÜR LASTWAGEN UND/ODER ANHÄNGER | [2005/12] | English: | ANTI-THEFT IMMOBILIZATION SYSTEM FOR TRUCKS AND/OR HANGERS | [2005/12] | French: | SYSTEME D'IMMOBILISATION ANTIVOL POUR CAMIONS ET/OU REMORQUES | [2005/12] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.12.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 16.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2007 | BE | 14.02.2007 | CH | 14.02.2007 | CY | 14.02.2007 | CZ | 14.02.2007 | EE | 14.02.2007 | FI | 14.02.2007 | LI | 14.02.2007 | RO | 14.02.2007 | SI | 14.02.2007 | SK | 14.02.2007 | TR | 14.02.2007 | BG | 15.05.2007 | GR | 15.05.2007 | IE | 13.06.2007 | LU | 13.06.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | PT | 16.07.2007 | HU | 15.08.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
CY | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
EE | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LU | 13.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
CY | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
EE | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
EE | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CH | 14.02.2007 | |
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]CN1181329 ; | [X]US5481253 (PHELAN MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 9,14 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 11 *; | [Y]US2001050509 (HOLT JOHN P [US]) [Y] 2,3,11-13 * page 2, paragraph 13 * * page 3, paragraph 27 * * page 4, paragraph 30 - paragraph 31 *; | [XY]EP1209048 (PREZIOSO RUGGERO [IT]) [X] 1,10-12,15,16,18 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 11 * * column 2, line 43 - line 48 * * column 3, line 47 - line 56 * * column 5, line 15 - line 24 * * column 5, line 49 - line 57 * * column 6, line 22 - line 34; figure 1 * [Y] 2,3,11-13; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 40, Database accession no. 2002-363406, XP002255053 & CN1181329 A 19980513 (AAA PLUS INT INC) [X] 19-22 * abstract * |