EP1558519 - SUPPRESSION OF METHANATION ACTIVITY OF PLATINUM GROUP METAL WATER-GAS SHIFT CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENGELHARD CORPORATION 101 Wood Avenue, P.O. Box 770 Iselin, NJ 08830-0770 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states Engelhard Corporation 101 Wood Avenue, P.O. Box 770 Iselin, NJ 08830-0770 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUETTINGER, Wolfgang, F. 16 Wendover Road East Windsor, NJ 08520 / US | 02 /
FARRAUTO, Robert, J. 7 Lavender Drive Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03760265.3 | 10.06.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003US18303 | Priority number, date | US20020170079 | 12.06.2002 Original published format: US 170079 | [2005/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03106332 | Date: | 24.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1558519 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/16 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
B01J37/038 (EP,US);
B01J23/62 (EP,US);
B01J23/626 (EP,US);
B01J23/63 (EP,US);
B01J37/0207 (EP,US);
C01B3/16 (EP,US);
H01M8/0618 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
B01J37/0215 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0233 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0283 (EP,US);
C01B2203/044 (EP,US);
C01B2203/047 (EP,US);
C01B2203/066 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1023 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1064 (EP,US);
C01B2203/107 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1082 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1094 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1241 (EP,US);
H01M8/0631 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNTERDRÜCKEN DER METHANISIERUNGSAKTIVITÄT EINES WASSERGAS-SHIFT-KATALYSATORS DER PLATINMETALLGRUPPE | [2005/31] | English: | SUPPRESSION OF METHANATION ACTIVITY OF PLATINUM GROUP METAL WATER-GAS SHIFT CATALYSTS | [2005/31] | French: | SUPPRESSION DE L'ACTIVITE DE METHANATION DE CATALYSEURS DE CONVERSION A LA VAPEUR D'EAU CONTENANT DES METAUX DU GROUPE DU PLATINE | [2005/31] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 04.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/26] | 09.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2012607 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO) [A] 1,15,18 * example 5 *; | [A]US5298154 (KHARE GYANESH P [US], et al) [A] 1,15,18* example 1 *; | [A]EP1046612 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,15,18,21 * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO0226618 (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [A] 1,15,18 * the whole document *; | [XA] - KIRSZENSZTEJN PIOTR ET AL, "Dispersity of Al2O3-SnO2 supported platinum from hydrogen pulse chemisorption", REACT KINET CATAL LETT; REACTION KINETICS AND CATALYSIS LETTERS JUNE 1994 ELSEVIER SCIENCE B.V., AMSTERDAM, NETH, (199406), vol. 52, no. 2, pages 467 - 474, XP002259695 [X] 1-4,7,18-20 [A] 21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02067823 | [A] - ACS 215th National Meeing Book of Abstract Part 1, ACS, (1998), XP002259541 [A] 15,21 * page 266 * |