EP1514805 - POUCH-LIKE BLOW MOLDED CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd. No. 2-6, Ojima 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 136-8531 / JP | [2008/49] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd. No. 2-6, Ojima 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 136-8531 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMANAKA, Nobuo c/o Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd. 2-6, Ojima 3-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo 136-8531 / JP | 02 /
KISHI, Takao c/o Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd. 2-6, Ojima 3-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo 136-8531 / JP | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | Gray, James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | Gray, James, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03760902.1 | 19.06.2003 | [2005/11] | WO2003JP07783 | Priority number, date | JP20020179688 | 20.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002179688 | JP20020180210 | 20.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002180210 | [2005/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004000671 | Date: | 31.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1514805 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1514805 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65D35/02 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
B65D35/08 (EP,KR);
B65D35/02 (KR);
B65D1/32 (KR);
B29C49/00 (EP);
B29L2023/20 (EP);
B65D2207/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/41] |
Former [2005/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEUTELFÖRMIGER BLASGEFORMTER BEHÄLTER | [2005/11] | English: | POUCH-LIKE BLOW MOLDED CONTAINER | [2005/11] | French: | CONTENANT DE TYPE SACHET MOULE PAR SOUFFLAGE | [2005/11] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2004 | Translation filed | 27.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 31.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07019270.3 / EP1870345 | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPH0356546U ; | [Y]JPH04115145U ; | [Y]JP2001114307 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD); | [Y]WO0238360 (GRAHAM PACKAGING CO [US], et al); | [Y]JPS5217267U ; | [Y]JPS4014714Y ; | [Y]JP2001219948 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD); | [Y]JPS4839560 ; | [Y]JPS6077868 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JPH08258853 (SHISEIDO CO LTD); | [YP]JP2002193232 (FUJI SEAL INC) | by applicant | JP2001114307 |