Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004107537 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004073158 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US0308671 | 28.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004073157 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2004 | A3 | WO2004073157 | 26.08.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73679203 | 17.12.2003 | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US0308671 | 28.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004073155 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US0308671 | 28.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004071800 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2005 | A9 | WO2004071800 | 26.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73690103 | 17.12.2003 | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US0308671 | 28.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004070934 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US35308303 | 29.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004001949 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US29053702 | 08.11.2002 | US35308303 | 29.01.2003 | US39941502 | 31.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004001945 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2004 | A3 | WO2004001945 | 31.12.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US29053702 | 08.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6940242 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2005 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005184689 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US8390105 | 21.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005127856 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73679203 | 17.12.2003 | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US39941502 | 31.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005052080 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73690103 | 17.12.2003 | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US39941502 | 31.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005046375 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73679103 | 17.12.2003 | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US39941502 | 31.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005045392 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73689603 | 17.12.2003 | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US39941502 | 31.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004263099 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80980804 | 26.03.2004 | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US45793803 | 28.03.2003 | US39941502 | 31.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7204011 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2007 | B2 | US2004200057 | 14.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US77149604 | 05.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6919700 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2005 | B2 | US2004145323 | 29.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35308303 | 29.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004021437 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US39941502 | 31.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20050097528 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US35308303 | 29.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20050013223 | Global Dossier | 03.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US29053702 | 08.11.2002 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US35308303 | 29.01.2003 | US0308671 | 28.03.2003 | US39941502 | 31.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20050012800 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US0308675 | 28.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20050012778 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0312116 | 30.04.2003 | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US29053702 | 08.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4267626B | Global Dossier | 27.05.2009 | B2 | JP2006515148 | 18.05.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004US02377 | 29.01.2004 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US35308303 | 29.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006238698 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US29053702 | 08.11.2002 | US35308303 | 29.01.2003 | US39941502 | 31.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3814624B | Global Dossier | 30.08.2006 | B2 | JP2005530477 | 06.10.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US0308675 | 28.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005522178 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0312116 | 30.04.2003 | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US29053702 | 08.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005520478 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US29053702 | 08.11.2002 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US35308303 | 29.01.2003 | US0308671 | 28.03.2003 | US39941502 | 31.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1588482 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US02377 | 29.01.2004 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US35308303 | 29.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1522141 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2007 | B1 | EP1522141 | 13.04.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0312116 | 30.04.2003 | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US29053702 | 08.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1413046 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2006 | B1 | EP1413046 | 28.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US29053702 | 08.11.2002 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US35308303 | 29.01.2003 | US0308671 | 28.03.2003 | US39941502 | 31.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004209277B | Global Dossier | 15.03.2007 | B2 | AU2004209277 | 19.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US02377 | 29.01.2004 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US35308303 | 29.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003225912 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US0308675 | 28.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003223318 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US29053702 | 08.11.2002 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US35308303 | 29.01.2003 | US0308671 | 28.03.2003 | US39941502 | 31.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003221991 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2004 | A8 | AU2003221991 | 06.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0312116 | 30.04.2003 | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US29053702 | 08.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1516425 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2007 | B1 | EP1516425 | 23.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US0308675 | 28.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE326789T | 15.06.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US29053702 | 08.11.2002 | US35308303 | 29.01.2003 | US39941502 | 31.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE378726T | 15.11.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US29053702 | 08.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0311506 | 22.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0312116 | 30.04.2003 | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US29053702 | 08.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0311943 | 29.03.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US29053702 | 08.11.2002 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US35308303 | 29.01.2003 | US0308671 | 28.03.2003 | US39941502 | 31.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0311947 | 05.04.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US0308671 | 28.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0407095 | 24.01.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004US02377 | 29.01.2004 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US35308303 | 29.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2483672 | 31.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US29053702 | 08.11.2002 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US35308303 | 29.01.2003 | US0308671 | 28.03.2003 | US39941502 | 31.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2510649 | 17.04.2007 | C | CA2510649 | 19.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US02377 | 29.01.2004 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US35308303 | 29.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100359796C | 02.01.2008 | C | CN1659777 | 24.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US29053702 | 08.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100397780C | 25.06.2008 | C | CN1754307 | 29.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60305263T | 29.03.2007 | T2 | DE60305263D1 | 22.06.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US29053702 | 08.11.2002 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US35308303 | 29.01.2003 | US0308671 | 28.03.2003 | US39941502 | 31.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60313458T | 03.01.2008 | T2 | DE60313458D1 | 06.06.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US0308675 | 28.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60317514T | 11.09.2008 | T2 | DE60317514D1 | 27.12.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US0312116 | 30.04.2003 | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US29053702 | 08.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2264763T | 16.01.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US29053702 | 08.11.2002 | US35308303 | 29.01.2003 | US39941502 | 31.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA04012323 | 08.04.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | US29053702 | 08.11.2002 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US35930503 | 06.02.2003 | US35308303 | 29.01.2003 | US0308671 | 28.03.2003 | US39941502 | 31.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA05008102 | 19.10.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004US02377 | 29.01.2004 | US35307503 | 29.01.2003 | US35308303 | 29.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI281892B | 01.06.2007 | B | TW200531859 | 01.10.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US73690103 | 17.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200600371 | 01.01.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US73689603 | 17.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200601682 | 01.01.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US73679103 | 17.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200601683 | 01.01.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US73679203 | 17.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200607209 | 16.02.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US77149604 | 05.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6794839 | 21.09.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US29053702 | 08.11.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004001953 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE360915T | 15.05.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100397778C | 25.06.2008 | C | CN1663110 | 31.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2286463T | 01.12.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6727668 | 27.04.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US17361002 | 19.06.2002 |