19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
21.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
15.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] |
14.01.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] |
29.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] |
01.10.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] |
27.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] |
30.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] |
25.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
21.05.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] |
07.05.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] |
30.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] |
06.11.2009 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] |
23.10.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] |
16.10.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.10.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.06.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.08.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.06.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.02.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.06.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.12.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.09.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.06.2006 |
First examination report |
|
28.06.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.08.2005 |
Change - extension states |
published on 12.10.2005 [2005/41] |
17.06.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.02.2005 |
Request for preliminary examination |
|
04.02.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.03.2005 [2005/12] |
04.02.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.03.2005 [2005/12] |
01.02.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.01.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.01.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|