Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010046666 | Global Dossier | 25.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60909609 | 30.10.2009 | US17944202 | 24.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20050013633 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0319464 | 20.06.2003 | US17944202 | 24.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4468167B | Global Dossier | 26.05.2010 | B2 | JP2005531218 | 13.10.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0319464 | 20.06.2003 | US17944202 | 24.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2144390 | Global Dossier | 13.01.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US17944202 | 24.06.2002 | EP03761175 | 20.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003243679C | Global Dossier | 23.07.2009 | C1 | AU2003243679B | 26.02.2009 | B2 | AU2003243679 | 06.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0319464 | 20.06.2003 | US17944202 | 24.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1516448 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2009 | B1 | EP1516448 | 23.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0319464 | 20.06.2003 | US17944202 | 24.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE450094T | 15.12.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US0319464 | 20.06.2003 | US17944202 | 24.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0312089 | 29.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US0319464 | 20.06.2003 | US17944202 | 24.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2490642 | 31.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0319464 | 20.06.2003 | US17944202 | 24.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60330242D1 | 07.01.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US0319464 | 20.06.2003 | US17944202 | 24.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL165939 | 30.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US0319464 | 20.06.2003 | US17944202 | 24.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA05000097 | 06.06.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0319464 | 20.06.2003 | US17944202 | 24.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20050351L | 18.03.2005 | L | Priority number | Date | US0319464 | 20.06.2003 | US17944202 | 24.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004002047 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17944202 | 24.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20100080950 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US17944202 | 24.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010136396 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US17944202 | 24.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100459481C | 04.02.2009 | C | CN1675873 | 28.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US17944202 | 24.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2335583T | 30.03.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US17944202 | 24.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2317648 | 20.02.2008 | C2 | RU2005101422 | 10.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US17944202 | 24.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI327427B | 11.07.2010 | B | TW200404422 | 16.03.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US17944202 | 24.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201029370 | 01.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US17944202 | 24.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA89609 | 25.02.2010 | C2 | Priority number | Date | US17944202 | 24.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7613248 | 03.11.2009 | B2 | US2003235255 | 25.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17944202 | 24.06.2002 | Type | Divisional application | EP2144390 |