EP1516448 - SIGNAL PROCESSING WITH CHANNEL EIGENMODE DECOMPOSITION AND CHANNEL INVERSION FOR MIMO SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm, Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2005/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KETCHUM, John W. 37 Candleberry Lane Harvard, MA 01451 / US | 02 /
WALTON, Jay R. 7 Ledgewood Drive Westford, MA 01886 / US | [2005/12] | Representative(s) | Walsh, Michael Joseph, et al Tomkins & Co. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | Walsh, Michael Joseph, et al TOMKINS & CO. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 03761175.3 | 20.06.2003 | [2005/12] | WO2003US19464 | Priority number, date | US20020179442 | 24.06.2002 Original published format: US 179442 | [2005/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004002047 | Date: | 31.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1516448 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1516448 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/06, H04L25/03, H04L25/02 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
H04B7/0417 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0439 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0443 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0626 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0618 (EP,KR,US);
H04L25/0202 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIGNALVERARBEITUNG MIT EIGENMODE-ZERLEGUNG UND KANALINVERSION FÜR MIMO-SYSTEME | [2005/12] | English: | SIGNAL PROCESSING WITH CHANNEL EIGENMODE DECOMPOSITION AND CHANNEL INVERSION FOR MIMO SYSTEMS | [2005/12] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL PAR DECOMPOSITION EN MODE PROPRE DE LA VOIE DE TRANSMISSION ET INVERSION DE LA VOIE DE TRANSMISSION DANS DES SYSTEMES MIMO | [2005/12] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 30.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09174809.5 / EP2144390 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.11.2009 | CY | 25.11.2009 | DK | 25.11.2009 | EE | 25.11.2009 | SI | 25.11.2009 | SK | 25.11.2009 | TR | 25.11.2009 | GR | 26.02.2010 | PT | 25.03.2010 | LU | 20.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
LU | 20.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | SI | 25.11.2009 | |
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | PT | 25.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0549019 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 2-12,19,20,31-34 * abstract ** page 2, line 25 - line 30 *; | [XA]WO0205506 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1,13-18,21-30,35-40 * abstract * * page 13, line 4 - line 11 * * page 14, line 24 - page 19, line 4 * [A] 2-12,19,20,31-34; | [XA] - SAMPATH H ET AL, "Joint transmit and receive optimization for high data rate wireless communication using multiple antennas", SIGNALS, SYSTEMS, AND COMPUTERS, 1999. CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE THIRTY-THIRD ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON OCT. 24-27, 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19991024), ISBN 0-7803-5700-0, pages 215 - 219, XP010373976 [X] 1,13-18,21-30,35-40 * abstract * * page 215, paragraph 2 * * page 215, paragraph 5 - page 216, paragraph 2 * * page 217, column 2 - page 218, paragraph 1 * [A] 2-12,19,20,31-34 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.1999.832325 | [XA] - JOONSUK KIM ET AL, "Transmission Optimization with a Space-Time Filter at Low SNR Wireless Environment", GLOBECOM'99, (19991205), vol. 1B, pages 889 - 893, XP010373673 [X] 1,13-18,21-30,35-40 * abstract * * page 890, column 1, paragraph L - page 892, column 1, paragraph 2 * [A] 2-12,19,20,31-34 | [XA] - BURR A G, "Adaptive space-time signal processing and coding", IEEE, (20001022), vol. 2, pages 710 - 714, XP010531996 [X] 1,13-18,21-30,35-40 * abstract * * page 710, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 712, column 1, paragraph 3 * [A] 2-12,19,20,31-34 |