EP1527372 - FILM FEED MECHANISM IN A MOTION-PICTURE CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARNOLD & RICHTER CINE TECHNIK GMBH & CO. BETRIEBS KG Postfach 40 01 49 80701 München / DE | [2007/27] |
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states ARNOLD & RICHTER CINE TECHNIK GMBH & CO. BETRIEBS KG Postfach 40 01 49 80701 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAUNINGER, Walter Karl-Kühmayergasse 17 A-2381 Laab im Walde / AT | [2005/18] | Representative(s) | Ninnemann, Detlef, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Ninnemann, Detlef, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2005/18] | Ninnemann, Detlef, Dipl.-Ing., et al Maikowski & Ninnemann, Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 03761418.7 | 11.06.2003 | [2005/18] | WO2003DE01987 | Priority number, date | DE2002129380 | 26.06.2002 Original published format: DE 10229380 | [2005/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004003657 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1527372 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1527372 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G03B1/22, G03B1/00 | [2005/18] | CPC: |
G03B1/00 (EP,US);
G03B1/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, GB [2005/42] |
Former [2005/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FILMSCHALTWERK IN EINER LAUFBILD-FILMAUFNAHMEKAMERA | [2005/18] | English: | FILM FEED MECHANISM IN A MOTION-PICTURE CAMERA | [2005/18] | French: | MECANISME D'AVANCEMENT DE FILM D'UNE CAMERA CINEMATOGRAPHIQUE | [2005/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 19.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3524573 (KOTLER MAX, et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US3774828 (LACH R, et al) [A] 1-3 * figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US3791566 (FLIESSER E) [A] 1-15 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4003647 (KUPPENS BERNARDUS JOHANNES) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |