Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003251136 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0215149 | 01.07.2002 | GB0302776 | 30.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1551598 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0215149 | 01.07.2002 | GB0302776 | 30.06.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004002688 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0215149 | 01.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2390320 | 07.01.2004 | A | GB0215149D0 | 07.08.2002 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0215149 | 01.07.2002 |