EP1548093 - OIL-IN-WATER EMULSION COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAIYO KAGAKU Co., LTD. 9-5, Akahori-Shinmachi Yokkaichi-shi Mie-ken 510-0825 / JP | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA YAKULT HONSHA 1-19, Higashishinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8660 / JP | [2007/11] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Taiyo Kagaku Co., Ltd. 9-5, Akahori-Shinmachi Yokkaichi-shi Mie-ken 510-0825 / JP | ||
For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Yakult Honsha 1-19, Higashishinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8660 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIKAWA, Makoto, c/o Taiyo Kagaku Co., Ltd. 9-5, Akahorishinmachi Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0825 / JP | 02 /
NANBU, Hironobu, c/o Taiyo Kagaku Co., Ltd. 9-5, Akahorishinmachi Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0825 / JP | 03 /
JUNEJA, Lekh Raj, c/o Taiyo Kagaku Co., Ltd. 9-5, Akahorishinmachi Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0825 / JP | 04 /
OGASAWARA, Nobuhiro, c/o K. K. Yakult Honsha 1-19, Higashishinbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8660 / JP | 05 /
NAKANO, Masatoshi, c/o Kabushiki K. Yakult Honsha 1-19, Higashishinbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8660 / JP | 06 /
AKAHOSHI, Ryoichi, c/o Kabushiki K. Yakult Honsha 1-19, Higashishinbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo10 5-8660 / JP | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03761811.3 | 26.06.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003JP08068 | Priority number, date | JP20020191442 | 28.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002191442 | [2005/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004003119 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1548093 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1548093 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.01.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C11B5/00, A23D9/007, A23D7/00, A23L1/30, A23L1/015 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
A23D9/06 (EP,US);
A23D7/0053 (EP,BR,US);
C11B5/00 (KR);
A23C9/1315 (EP,US);
A23C9/1528 (EP,US);
A23D7/003 (EP,US);
A23D9/00 (EP,US);
A23D9/007 (EP,US);
A23L33/12 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/1882, A23V2200/222 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÖL-IN-WASSER-EMULSIONSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2005/26] | English: | OIL-IN-WATER EMULSION COMPOSITION | [2005/26] | French: | COMPOSITION D'EMULSION HUILE-DANS-EAU | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2005 | Translation filed | 19.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 10.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.03.2007 | CZ | 14.03.2007 | DK | 14.03.2007 | EE | 14.03.2007 | FI | 14.03.2007 | RO | 14.03.2007 | SI | 14.03.2007 | SK | 14.03.2007 | TR | 14.03.2007 | BG | 14.06.2007 | SE | 14.06.2007 | GR | 15.06.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | PT | 14.08.2007 | HU | 15.09.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | CY | 14.03.2007 | |
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
BG | 14.06.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 14.03.2007 | |
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | FI | 14.03.2007 | |
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 14.03.2007 | |
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | FI | 14.03.2007 | |
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | FI | 14.03.2007 | |
SE | 14.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05287294 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940210), vol. 018, no. 082, Database accession no. (C - 1164), & JP05287294 A 19931102 (NIPPON OIL & FATS CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH07327604 (NITSUPONRIIBA BV, et al); | [Y]JPH08187051 (MIYOSHI YUSHI KK); | [Y]JPH08228678 (TAIYO KAGAKU KK); | [Y]JPH09154484 (SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD) |