EP1517990 - ISOLATION OF NUCLEIC ACIDS USING A POLYCATIONIC POLYMER AS PRECIPITATION AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Björkgatan 30 75184 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB 751 84 Uppsala / SE | ||
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states Amersham Biosciences AB Bjorkgatan 30 751 84 Uppsala / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALAEV, Igor Yu Lund University, P.O. Box 124 S-221 00 Lund / SE | 02 /
GUSTAVSSON, Per-Erik Lund University, P.. Box 124 S-221 00 Lund / SE | 03 /
IZUMRUDOV, Vladimir A, Polymer Chemistry Dpt. Chemical Faculty, Moscow State University 119899 Moscow / RU | 04 /
LARSSON, Per-Olof Lund University, P.O. Box 124 S-221 00 Lund / SE | 05 /
WAHLUND, Per-Olof Lund University, P.O. Box 124 S-221 00 Lund / SE | [2007/47] |
Former [2005/13] | 01 /
GALAEV, Igor Yu Lund University, P.O. Box 124 S-221 00 Lund / SE | ||
02 /
GUSTAVSSON, Per-Erik Lunc University, P.. Box 124 S-221 00 Lund / SE | |||
03 /
IZUMRUDOV, Vladimir A, Polymer Chemistry Dpt. Chemical Faculty, Moscow State University 119899 Moscow / RU | |||
04 /
LARSSON, Per-Olof Lund University, P.O. Box 124 S-221 00 Lund / SE | |||
05 /
WAHLUND, Per-Olof Lund University, P.O. Box 124 S--221 00 Lund / SE | Representative(s) | Franks, Barry Gerard, et al GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | Franks, Barry Gerard, et al Amersham plc, Amersham Place Little Chalfont, Bucks. HP7 9NA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03761887.3 | 26.06.2003 | [2005/13] | WO2003SE01127 | Priority number, date | SE20020002074 | 28.06.2002 Original published format: SE 0202074 | SE20030001034 | 08.04.2003 Original published format: SE 0301034 | [2005/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004003200 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1517990 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1517990 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 08.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10, C07H1/06, C07H1/08 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
C07H1/06 (EP,US);
C07H1/08 (EP,US);
C12N15/1003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ISOLIERUNG VON NUKLEINSÄUREN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES POLYKATIONISCHEN POLYMERS ALS FÄLLUNGSMITTEL | [2005/13] | English: | ISOLATION OF NUCLEIC ACIDS USING A POLYCATIONIC POLYMER AS PRECIPITATION AGENT | [2005/13] | French: | ISOLATION D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES A L'AIDE D'UN POLYMERE POLYCATIONIQUE UTILISE EN TANT QU'AGENT DE PRECIPITATION | [2005/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 22.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 18.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.03.2008 | BE | 19.03.2008 | CY | 19.03.2008 | CZ | 19.03.2008 | DK | 19.03.2008 | EE | 19.03.2008 | FI | 19.03.2008 | RO | 19.03.2008 | SI | 19.03.2008 | SK | 19.03.2008 | TR | 19.03.2008 | BG | 19.06.2008 | GR | 20.06.2008 | IE | 26.06.2008 | LU | 26.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | PT | 26.08.2008 | HU | 20.09.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
TR | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
IE | 26.06.2008 | ||
LU | 26.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
HU | 20.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
IE | 26.06.2008 | ||
LU | 26.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
HU | 20.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
IE | 26.06.2008 | ||
LU | 26.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
IE | 26.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
IE | 26.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4055469 (SNOKE ROY EUGENE, et al); | [A]EP0281390 (LYLE J ARNOLD JR [US], et al); | [A]US5010183 (MACFARLANE DONALD E [US]); | [Y]EP1031626 (QIAGEN GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2002010145 (WILLSON RICHARD C [US], et al); | [X] - IZUMRUDOV VLADIMIR A. ET AL., "Controllable stability of DNA-containing polyelectrolyte complexes in water-salt solutions", BIOPOLYMERS (NUCLEIC ACID SCIENCES), (1999), vol. 52, pages 94 - 108, XP002979408 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1097-0282(1999)52:2<94::AID-BIP3>3.0.CO;2-O | [X] - KABANOV ALEXANDER V. ET AL., "DNA interpolyelectrolyte complexes as a tool for efficient cell transformation", BIOPOLYMERS, (1991), vol. 31, pages 1437 - 1443, XP000918675 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bip.360311210 | [A] - ZELIKIN ALEXANDER N. ET AL., "Polyelectrolyte complexes formed by calf thymus DNA and aliphatic ionenes: Unexpected change in stability upon variation of chain length of ionenes of different charge density", MACROMOL. BIOSCI., (2002), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 78 - 81, XP002979409 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1616-5195(20020201)2:2<78::AID-MABI78>3.0.CO;2-7 | [A] - RAMSDEN D.K. ET AL., "Flocculation of cellular material in complex fermentation medium with the flocculant poly(diallyldimethylammonium chloride)", BIOTECHNOLOGY TECHNIQUES, (199808), vol. 12, no. 8, pages 599 - 603, XP002979410 | [A] - CIHLAR TOMAS ET AL., "Efficient separation of natural ribonucleotides by low-.pressure anion-exchange chromatography", BIOSIS, Database accession no. (PREV199396107533), XP002984043 | [ ] - JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1993), vol. 644, no. 2, pages 299 - 305 |