EP1534859 - METHODS OF DETECTING SEQUENCE DIFFERENCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PrimeraDx, Inc. 171 Forbes Blvd., Suite 2000 Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2010/47] |
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states PrimeraDx, Inc. 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Wilmington, New Castle, DE / US | ||
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states Primera Biosystems, Inc. One Richmond Square Providence, RI 02906 / US | ||
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Sention, Inc. 1 Richmond Square, 3rd Floor Providence, RI 02906 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLEPNEV, Vladimir, I. 6908 Turpin View Dr. Cincinnati, OH 45244 / US | [2010/46] |
Former [2005/22] | 01 /
SLEPNEV, Vladimir, I. 171 Fairway Drive Coventry, RI 02816 / US | Representative(s) | Dempster, Robert Charles, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | Dempster, Robert Charles, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2005/22] | Soames, Candida Jane D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03761972.3 | 20.06.2003 | [2005/22] | WO2003US19576 | Priority number, date | US20020392331P | 28.06.2002 Original published format: US 392331 P | [2005/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004003136 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1534859 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1534859 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.08.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12P19/34, C07H21/04 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6858 (EP,KR,US);
C12P19/34 (KR);
C12Q2525/155 (KR);
C12Q2535/125 (KR);
C12Q2537/143 (KR);
C12Q2565/125 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6858, C12Q2537/143, C12Q2535/125, C12Q2525/155 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6858, C12Q2565/125, C12Q2535/125, C12Q2525/155 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS VON SEQUENZUNTERSCHIEDEN | [2005/22] | English: | METHODS OF DETECTING SEQUENCE DIFFERENCES | [2005/22] | French: | METHODES DE DETECTION DE POLYMORPHISMES GENETIQUES | [2005/22] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.01.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 16.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.11.2010 | BE | 24.11.2010 | CY | 24.11.2010 | CZ | 24.11.2010 | DK | 24.11.2010 | EE | 24.11.2010 | FI | 24.11.2010 | HU | 24.11.2010 | IT | 24.11.2010 | NL | 24.11.2010 | RO | 24.11.2010 | SE | 24.11.2010 | SI | 24.11.2010 | SK | 24.11.2010 | TR | 24.11.2010 | BG | 24.02.2011 | GR | 25.02.2011 | ES | 07.03.2011 | PT | 24.03.2011 | IE | 20.06.2011 | LU | 20.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
TR | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
IE | 20.06.2011 | ||
LU | 20.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
IE | 20.06.2011 | ||
LU | 20.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
IE | 20.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
IE | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0129260 (AFFYMETRIX INC [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO0181631 (DNA SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [PA]WO03002752 (RUBICON GENOMICS INC [US], et al) [PA] * the whole document *; | [A] - PIGGEE C A ET AL, "Capillary electrophoresis for the detection of known point mutations by single-nucleotide primer extension and laser-induced fluorescence detection", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970926), vol. 781, no. 1-2, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 367 - 375, XP004094567 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(97)00637-7 | International search | [A]US6015675 (CASKEY CHARLES THOMAS [US], et al); | [Y] - MCCLAY ET AL, "High-throughput single-nucleotide polymorphism genotyping by fluorescent competitive allele-specific polymerase chain reaction (SNiPTag)", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 301, pages 200 - 206, XP002973186 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.2001.5509 | [A] - MYAKISHEV ET AL, "High-throughput SNP genotyping by allele-specific PCR with universal energy-transfer-labeled primers", GENOME RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 11, pages 163 - 169, XP002242292 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gr.157901 | by applicant | US4683202 | US4683195 | US4800159 | US4914210 | US5963456 | US6001230 | US6156178 | US6217731 | US6270973 | US6312893 | US6322980 | - KANEHISA, M., POLYNUCLEOTIDE RES, (1984), vol. 12, page 203 | - MULLIS; FALOONA, METHODS ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 155, page 335 | - SAIKI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 230, page 1350 | US20020392331 |