06.02.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
28.02.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
21.02.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.02.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
29.10.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.10.2013 |
Change - German title |
published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] |
14.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.07.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.06.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.02.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.10.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.08.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] |
04.07.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.08.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] |
06.07.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.03.2007 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
09.03.2007 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
07.03.2007 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
07.03.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.03.2007 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
06.03.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.02.2007 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.11.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.07.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.06.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.06.2006 |
First examination report |
|
02.09.2005 |
Change - designated states |
published on 19.10.2005 [2005/42] |
02.09.2005 |
Change - extension states |
published on 19.10.2005 [2005/42] |
04.02.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.03.2005 [2005/12] |
04.02.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.03.2005 [2005/12] |
24.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.04.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.01.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.01.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|