Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003247714 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18419602 | 27.06.2002 | US0320148 | 26.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1516206 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2014 | B1 | EP1516206 | 23.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18419602 | 27.06.2002 | US0320148 | 26.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2490936 | 15.09.2009 | C | CA2490936 | 08.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18419602 | 27.06.2002 | US0320148 | 26.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20045692L | 29.03.2005 | L | Priority number | Date | US18419602 | 27.06.2002 | US0320148 | 26.06.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004003590 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18419602 | 27.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY135782 | 30.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US18419602 | 27.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6920082 | 19.07.2005 | B2 | US2004001389 | 01.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18419602 | 27.06.2002 |