EP1516206 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMING EARTH FORMATION SHEAR-WAVE TRANSVERSE ISOTROPY FROM BOREHOLE STONELEY-WAVE MEASUREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAKER HUGHES INCORPORATED 2929 Allen Parkway, Suite 2100 Houston, TX 77019-2118 / US | [2008/36] |
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states Baker Hughes Incorporated 2929 Allen Parkway, Suite 2100 Houston, TX 77019 / US | ||
Former [2005/12] | For all designated states BAKER HUGHES INCORPORATED 3900 Essex Lane Suite 1200 Houston, Texas 77027 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Xiao, Ming 4119 St. Ives Sugar Land, TX 77479 / US | [2005/12] | Representative(s) | Hano, Christian, et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | [2014/14] |
Former [2005/12] | Hano, Christian, Dipl.-Ing., et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03762068.9 | 26.06.2003 | [2005/12] | WO2003US20148 | Priority number, date | US20020184196 | 27.06.2002 Original published format: US 184196 | [2005/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004003590 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1516206 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1516206 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/50 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
G01V1/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2005/42] |
Former [2005/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER ERDFORMATIONS SCHERWELLEN-QUERISOTROPIE AUS MESSUNGEN VON STONELEYWELLEN IN EINEM BOHRLOCH | [2013/46] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMING EARTH FORMATION SHEAR-WAVE TRANSVERSE ISOTROPY FROM BOREHOLE STONELEY-WAVE MEASUREMENTS | [2005/12] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE DETERMINATION DE L'ISOTROPIE TRANSVERSALE D'ONDES EQUIVOLUMIQUES D'UNE FORMATION TERRESTRE A PARTIR DE MESURES D'ONDES DE STONELEY D'UN PUITS DE FORAGE | [2005/12] |
Former [2005/12] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER ERDFORMATIONS-SHEAR-WELLEN-QUERISOTROPHIE AUS STONELEY-WELLEN-BOHRLOCHMESSUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 04.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2006 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/11] | Request for further processing for: | 01.03.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 01.03.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.03.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4633449 (INGRAM JOHN D [US], et al) [Y] 1,8,14 * abstract * * column 8, line 62 - line 67 * * column 14, line 3 - line 26 *; | [A]US4698792 (KURKJIAN ANDREW L [US], et al) [A] 1,8,14 * abstract * * column 14, line 37 - line 56 *; | [A]US4797859 (HORNBY BRIAN E [US]) [A] 1,8,14 * abstract *; | [A]GB2292799 (SCHLUMBERGER LTD [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6351991 (SINHA BIKASH K [US]) [Y] 1,8,14 * abstract * * column 8, line 45 - line 60 *; | [DA] - NORRIS A N, "THE SPEED OF A TUBE WAVE", JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (1990), vol. 87, no. 1, ISSN 0001-4966, pages 414 - 417, XP000115362 [DA] 1,8,14 * abstract * ** tool modulus ** DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1121/1.399262 | [A] - TANG X M ET AL, "A DISPERSIVE-WAVE PROCESSING TECHNIQUE FOR ESTIMATING FORMATION SHEAR VELOCITY FROM DIPOLE AND STONELEY WAVEFORMS", GEOPHYSICS, SOCIETY OF EXPLORATION GEOPHYSICISTS. TULSA, US, (1995), vol. 60, no. 1, ISSN 0016-8033, pages 19 - 28, XP000507553 [A] 1,8,14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1190/1.1443747 | [DA] - SCHMITT D P, "ACOUSTIC MULTIPOLE LOGGING IN TRANSVERSELY ISOTROPIC POROELEASTIC FORMATIONS", JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19891201), vol. 86, no. 6, ISSN 0001-4966, pages 2397 - 2421, XP000106092 [DA] 1,8,14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1121/1.398448 | [DA] - ELLEFSEN K J ET AL, "ESTIMATING A SHEAR MODULUS OF A TRANSVERSELY ISOTROPIC FORMATION", GEOPHYSICS, SOCIETY OF EXPLORATION GEOPHYSICISTS. TULSA, US, (19921101), vol. 57, no. 11, ISSN 0016-8033, pages 1428 - 1434, XP000325076 [DA] 1,8,14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1190/1.1443210 |