EP1516508 - CONTROLLING GEOGRAPHIC LOCATION INFORMATION OF DEVICES OPERATING IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | ||
Former [2005/12] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOGIC, Aleksandar 3610 Torrey View Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2005/12] | Representative(s) | Walsh, Michael Joseph, et al Tomkins & Co. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | Walsh, Michael Joseph, et al TOMKINS & CO. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 03762169.5 | 28.06.2003 | [2005/12] | WO2003US20386 | Priority number, date | US20020185783 | 27.06.2002 Original published format: US 185783 | [2005/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004004404 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1516508 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1516508 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
G01S5/021 (EP,US);
H04W64/006 (US);
H04W64/00 (EP,US);
G01S5/0009 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNG GEOGRAPHISCHER STANDORTINFORMATIONEN VON DEN IN DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMEN ARBEITENDEN EINRICHTUNGEN | [2007/28] | English: | CONTROLLING GEOGRAPHIC LOCATION INFORMATION OF DEVICES OPERATING IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS | [2005/12] | French: | CONTROLE D'INFORMATIONS DE POSITION GEOGRAPHIQUE DE DISPOSITIFS FONCTIONNANT DANS DES SYSTEMES DE COMMUNICATION | [2005/12] |
Former [2005/12] | STEUERUNG GEOGRAPHISCHER STANDORTINFORMATIONEN VON DEN INT DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMEN ARBEITENDEN EINRICHTUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 05.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.12.2007 | CZ | 19.12.2007 | DK | 19.12.2007 | EE | 19.12.2007 | RO | 19.12.2007 | SI | 19.12.2007 | SK | 19.12.2007 | TR | 19.12.2007 | BG | 19.03.2008 | SE | 19.03.2008 | GR | 20.03.2008 | PT | 19.05.2008 | HU | 20.06.2008 | LU | 28.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 19.12.2007 | |
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
HU | 20.06.2008 | ||
LU | 28.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 19.12.2007 | |
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
LU | 28.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 19.12.2007 | |
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | SI | 19.12.2007 | |
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | SE | 19.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5365451 (WANG THERESA C Y [US], et al) [X] 23-26,29-31 * column 1, lines 38-52 * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 14 * * column 3, lines 14-61 * * column 5, line 59 - column 7, line 11 * [Y] 27,32; | [XY]EP1113678 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-6,11-16,21,22 * column 9, lines 4-35; figure 2 * [Y] 7-10,17-20; | [XY]WO0163960 (ERICSSON INC [US]) [X] 23-27,29-32 * page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 13 * * page 9, line 9 - page 12, line 2 * * page 20, lines 6-24 * * claims 7-22,36-42 * [Y] 28; | [Y]EP1156695 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 27,32 * column 4, paragraphs 17,19 ** column 9, paragraph 45 *; | [X]US2001055975 (MCDONNELL JAMES THOMAS EDWARD [GB], et al) [X] 1,11,22 * paragraphs [0030] , [0049] , [0051] , [0052] , [0058] *; | [YA]WO0232100 (DISCRETE WIRELESS INC [US]) [Y] 7-10,17-20,28 * page 9, line 28 - page 10, line 24 * [A] 23-27,29-32; | [X]US2002077127 (HECKARD MAX ALLEN [US], et al) [X] 1,11,22 * paragraphs [0012] - [0021] * |